This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/04/2022 at 05:18:21 (UTC).

KOSS Corporation v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 KOSS Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2091

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

KOSS CORPORATION

Appellee

APPLE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Mark G. Knedeisen

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

K&L Gates Center, 210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Appellee Attorney

Walter Karl Renner Esq.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1000 Maine Avenue Sw

Washington, DC 20024

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/01/2022. [864287] Entry of Appearance due 08/16/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/16/2022. Docketing Statement due 08/16/2022. Certified List due on 09/12/2022. [JCW] [Entered: 08/02/2022 11:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less