This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2019 at 06:06:59 (UTC).

Komatsu v. The City of New York

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Komatsu against The City of New York in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3188

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities

New York City Police Department

John Doe 1

Defendant / Appellees

Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer

Pinny Ringel

Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508)

Deputy Inspector Redmond Howard, New York City Police Department (NYPD)

Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141

NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves

NYPD Officer Yu Lie

NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326

NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577

Harold Miller

Rachel Atcheson

City of New York

Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478)

Deputy Inspector Howard Redmond, New York City Police Department (NYPD)

Plaintiff / Appellant

Towaki Komatsu

Bronx, NY 10460

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David Lawrence III

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Towaki Komatsu

802 Fairmount Place

Bronx, NY 10460

 

Court Documents

23 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

#49

(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [14], on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2685120] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:01 AM]

#32

(#9) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2672929] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:48 PM]

#50

(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [15], on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2685132] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:08 AM]

11 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

24 #1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

24 #2

Case FILED

23 #2

Supporting Document

#8

(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Rafael Beato, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and Pinny Ringel in 19-3100, 19-3169, 19-3188, Appellee Rafael Beato, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and -- Rachel Atcheson, Andrew Berkowitz, Harold Miller and Pinny Ringel in 19-3654, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2702866] [19-3100, 19-3169, 19-3188, 19-3654] [Entered: 11/08/2019 05:58 PM]

26 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Rafael Beato, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and Pinny Ringel, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2702869] [19-3188] [Entered: 11/08/2019 06:08 PM]

26 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#56

(#18) NOTICE, to Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Rafael Beato, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Redmond Howard, Yu Lie, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves and Pinny Ringel, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2687552] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/23/2019 05:22 PM]

11 #2

Supporting Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ATTORNEY, Jonathan A. Popolow, [ # 20 ], in place of attorney Georgia M. Pestana, SUBSTITUTED.[2704258] [19-3188] [Entered: 11/12/2019 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Rafael Beato, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and Pinny Ringel, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2702869] [19-3188] [Entered: 11/08/2019 06:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Rafael Beato, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and Pinny Ringel in 19-3100, 19-3169, 19-3188, Appellee Rafael Beato, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Yu Lie, Ralph Nieves, Howard Redmond and -- Rachel Atcheson, Andrew Berkowitz, Harold Miller and Pinny Ringel in 19-3654, FILED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2702866] [19-3100, 19-3169, 19-3188, 19-3654] [Entered: 11/08/2019 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE, to Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Rafael Beato, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola, Redmond Howard, Yu Lie, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves and Pinny Ringel, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2687552] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/23/2019 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [15], on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2685132] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [14], on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2685120] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#15) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 10/14/2019 by email.[2685009] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/21/2019 05:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 10/14/2019 by US mail.[2685006] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/21/2019 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 11 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2673970] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Matthew Brunner, Ramon Dominguez and Anthony Manzi in 19-3188, 19-3100, 19-3169, FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2673876] [19-3188, 19-3100, 19-3169] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2672929] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#8) NOTE: See lead case, 19-3100, containing complete set of docket entries.[2672921] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Matthew Brunner, Ramon Dominguez and Anthony Manzi in 19-3169, 19-3100, 19-3188, FILED. Service date 10/04/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2672810] [19-3169, 19-3100, 19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2672900] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/02/2019, RECEIVED.[2672898] [19-3188] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu in 19-3188, FILED. [2672888] [19-3188, 19-3100] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.