This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/05/2022 at 06:01:16 (UTC).

Kleiner v. Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Kleiner filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1451

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

FRED KLEINER, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

CENGAGE LEARNING HOLDINGS II, INC.

CENGAGE LEARNING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard Weingarten

Attorney at Slarskey LLC

420 Lexington Ave, Ste 2525

New York, NY 10170

Edward Vincent Colbert III

Attorney at Casner & Edwards LLP

303 Congress St

Boston, MA 02210-0000

David Koha

Attorney at Casner & Edwards LLP

303 Congress St

Boston, MA 02210-0000

David Slarskey

Attorney at Slarskey LLC

420 Lexington Ave, Ste 2525

New York, NY 10170

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael H. Gibson

Attorney at Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP

230 Park Ave

New York, NY 10169-0000

Michael Ross Gottfried

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 High St, Ste 2400

Boston, MA 02110-1724

Alanna B. Newman

Attorney at Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP

230 Park Ave

New York, NY 10169-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Cengage Learning, Inc. and Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. Brief due 09/23/2022 for appellee Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Cengage Learning, Inc. [22-1451] (JMK) [Entered: 07/27/2022 08:28 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Cengage Learning, Inc.. Served on 07/26/2022. [22-1451] (MRG) [Entered: 07/26/2022 03:19 PM]

Open Document

APPENDIX filed by Appellant Fred Kleiner. Served on 07/25/2022. Five paper copies of the electronically filed appendix must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/02/2022 [22-1451] (LIM) [Entered: 07/26/2022 09:21 AM]

Open Document #2

Appellee's Briefing Notice

Open Document #1

Appellant's Brief

Open Document

APPENDIX tendered by Appellant Fred Kleiner. Served on 07/25/2022. [22-1451] (RW) [Entered: 07/25/2022 01:36 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF tendered by Appellant Fred Kleiner. [22-1451] (RW) [Entered: 07/25/2022 01:35 PM]

Open Document

ORDER directing Appellant Fred Kleiner to file a conforming brief and appendix. Brief and Appendix due 07/28/2022 . [22-1451] (JMK) [Entered: 07/21/2022 08:51 AM]

Open Document

APPENDIX tendered by Appellant Fred Kleiner. Served on 07/18/2022. [22-1451] (RW) [Entered: 07/18/2022 02:18 PM]

Open Document

DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellees Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Cengage Learning, Inc.. Served on 06/08/2022. [22-1451] (MRG) [Entered: 06/08/2022 03:30 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Cengage Learning, Inc. filed by Attorney Michael R. Gottfried. Served on 06/08/2022. [22-1451] (MRG) [Entered: 06/08/2022 03:29 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Fred Kleiner. Served on 06/08/2022. [22-1451] (EVC) [Entered: 06/08/2022 01:01 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Fred Kleiner filed by Attorney Edward V Colbert III. Served on 06/08/2022. [22-1451] (EVC) [Entered: 06/08/2022 01:00 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketFIVE (5) paper copies of appendix [ # 6509750-2 ] submitted by Appellant Fred Kleiner. [22-1451] (AVN) [Entered: 08/01/2022 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6509746-2 ] submitted by Appellant Fred Kleiner. [22-1451] (AVN) [Entered: 08/01/2022 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Cengage Learning, Inc. and Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. Brief due 09/23/2022 for appellee Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Cengage Learning, Inc. [22-1451] (JMK) [Entered: 07/27/2022 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Cengage Learning, Inc.. Served on 07/26/2022. [22-1451] (MRG) [Entered: 07/26/2022 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX filed by Appellant Fred Kleiner. Served on 07/25/2022. Five paper copies of the electronically filed appendix must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/02/2022 [22-1451] (LIM) [Entered: 07/26/2022 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Fred Kleiner. Served on 07/25/2022. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/02/2022 . Brief due 08/24/2022 for APPELLEES Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Cengage Learning, Inc. [22-1451] (LIM) [Entered: 07/26/2022 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX tendered by Appellant Fred Kleiner. Served on 07/25/2022. [22-1451] (RW) [Entered: 07/25/2022 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF tendered by Appellant Fred Kleiner. [22-1451] (RW) [Entered: 07/25/2022 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER directing Appellant Fred Kleiner to file a conforming brief and appendix. Brief and Appendix due 07/28/2022 . [22-1451] (JMK) [Entered: 07/21/2022 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX tendered by Appellant Fred Kleiner. Served on 07/18/2022. [22-1451] (RW) [Entered: 07/18/2022 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Fred Kleiner indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 07/11/2022. [22-1451] (EVC) [Entered: 07/11/2022 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: David Slarskey for Fred Kleiner, Michael H. Gibson for Cengage Learning, Inc. and Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Alanna B. Newman for Cengage Learning, Inc. and Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. [22-1451] (JMK) [Entered: 07/08/2022 08:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Fred Kleiner filed by Attorney Richard Weingarten. Served on 07/07/2022. [22-1451] (RW) [Entered: 07/07/2022 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 07/07/2022, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: David Slarskey for Fred Kleiner, Richard Weingarten for Fred Kleiner, Michael H. Gibson for Cengage Learning, Inc. and Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Alanna B. Newman for Cengage Learning, Inc. and Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc.. [22-1451] (JMK) [Entered: 06/23/2022 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellees Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Cengage Learning, Inc.. Served on 06/08/2022. [22-1451] (MRG) [Entered: 06/08/2022 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. and Cengage Learning, Inc. filed by Attorney Michael R. Gottfried. Served on 06/08/2022. [22-1451] (MRG) [Entered: 06/08/2022 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Fred Kleiner. Served on 06/08/2022. [22-1451] (EVC) [Entered: 06/08/2022 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Fred Kleiner filed by Attorney Edward V Colbert III. Served on 06/08/2022. [22-1451] (EVC) [Entered: 06/08/2022 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 07/18/2022 for appellant Fred Kleiner. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [22-1451] (JMK) [Entered: 06/08/2022 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #27) filed by Appellant Fred Kleiner. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 06/22/2022 . [22-1451] (JMK) [Entered: 06/08/2022 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cengage Learning, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan B Newman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R. Gottfried

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Hugh Gibson