This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/18/2021 at 06:09:01 (UTC).

Klamath Irrigation District, et al v. U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 Klamath Irrigation District filed an Other lawsuit against U S Bureau of Reclamation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-36009

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VAN BRIMMER DITCH COMPANY

SHASTA VIEW IRRIGATION DISTRICT

ROB UNRUH

BEN DUVAL

KLAMATH DRAINAGE DISTRICT

TULELAKE IRRIGATION DISTRICT

KLAMATH WATER USERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant / Appellees

ERNEST CONANT, Director of the Mid-Pacific Region, Bureau of Reclamation, in his official capacity

UNITED STATES BUREAU OF RECLAMATION

JEFFREY NETTLETON, in his official capacity as Area Manager for the Klamath Area Reclamation Office

BRENDA BURMAN, Commissioner of the Bureau of Reclamation, in her official capacity

DAVID BERNHARDT, acting Secretary of the Interior, in his official capacity

Intervenor Defendant / Appellees

HOOPA VALLEY TRIBE

THE KLAMATH TRIBES

Plaintiff / Appellant

KLAMATH IRRIGATION DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kaitlyn Poirier

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

601 D Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Robert P. Williams Esquire

Attorney at DOJ - US Department of Justice

601 D Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Thomas K. Snodgrass

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

1961 Stout Street

Denver, CO 80294

Rachel E. Heron

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas Paul Schlosser

Attorney at Morisset, Schlosser, Jozwiak & Somerville

811 1St Avenue, Suite 218

Seattle, WA 98014

Thane D. Somerville

Attorney at Morisset, Schlosser, Jozwiak & Somerville

801 Second Avenue, 1115 Norton Building

Seattle, WA 98104

Jeremiah D. Weiner

Attorney at Rosette, LLP

1415 L Street, Suite 450

Sacramento, CA 95814

Jay D. Weiner

Attorney at Rosette, LLP

1415 L Street, Suite 450

Sacramento, CA 95814

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John Patrick Kinsey Esquire

Attorney at Wanger Jones Helsley PC

265 E. River Park Circle, Suite 310

Fresno, CA 93720

Nathan Robert Rietmann

Attorney at Rietmann Law PC

1270 Chemeketa Street, Ne

Salem, OR 97301

Christopher Lisieski

Attorney at Wanger Jones Helsley PC

265 E. River Park Circle, Suite 310

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#2

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11960924] [20-36009, 20-36020] (VS) [Entered: 01/12/2021 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 12/22/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11918191] [20-36009, 20-36020] (VS) [Entered: 12/08/2020 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Rachel E. Heron for party(s) Appellee Brenda Burman Appellee Ernest Conant Appellee David Bernhardt Appellee Jeffrey Nettleton Appellee United States Bureau of Reclamation, in case 20-36009. [11908898] (CW) [Entered: 11/30/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rachel Eileen Heron (U.S. Department of Justice, Environment & Natural Resources Division; P.O. Box 7415; Washington, DC 20044) for Appellees David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, Ernest Conant, Jeffrey Nettleton and United States Bureau of Reclamation. Date of service: 11/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11908860] [20-36009] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 11/30/2020 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/25/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11906644]. [20-36009] (AD) [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Klamath Irrigation District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/25/2020. [11906595] [20-36009] (Lisieski, Christopher) [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Klamath Irrigation District Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/27/2020. Transcript ordered by 12/21/2020. Transcript due 01/19/2021. Appellant Klamath Irrigation District opening brief due 03/01/2021. Appellees David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, Ernest Conant, Hoopa Valley Tribe, Jeffrey Nettleton, The Klamath Tribes and United States Bureau of Reclamation answering brief due 03/31/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11900098] (JBS) [Entered: 11/19/2020 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KLAMATH IRRIGATION DISTRICT is a litigant