This case was last updated from PACER on 06/10/2019 at 06:14:44 (UTC).

KK-PB Financial, LLC v. 160 Royal Palm, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 KK-PB Financial, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against 160 Royal Palm, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11402

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

KK-PB FINANCIAL, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

160 ROYAL PALM, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James N. Robinson

Attorney at White & Case, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4900

Miami, FL 33131

Fan B. He

Attorney at White & Case, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4900

Miami, FL 33131

John K. Cunningham

Attorney at White & Case, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4900

Miami, FL 33131

Jason Zakia

Attorney at White & Case, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4900

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bernice Cindy Lee

Attorney at Shraiberg Landau & Page, PA

2385 Nw Executive Center Dr Ste 300

Boca Raton, FL 33431-8530

Eric Scott Pendergraft

Attorney at Shraiberg Landau & Page, PA

2385 Nw Executive Center Dr Ste 300

Boca Raton, FL 33431-8530

Philip Joseph Landau

Attorney at Shraiberg Landau & Page, PA

2385 Nw Executive Center Dr Ste 300

Boca Raton, FL 33431-8530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC [ # 8791424-2 ] filed by Attorney Philip Joseph Landau for Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 06/05/2019 12:20 PM]

Open Document

MOTION MOTION for Leave to File Limited Sur-Reply to Address New Matters Raised in Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC's Reply on its Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by KK-PB Financial, LLC. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8791424-1] [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 06/04/2019 08:02 PM]

Open Document

Reply to response filed by Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 06/03/2019 03:14 PM]

Open Document #2

Exhibit A

Open Document #1

Reply to Response Filed

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC [ # 8779388-2 ] filed by Attorney Philip Joseph Landau for Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 05/31/2019 02:09 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion to dismiss appeal as moot filed by Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC [ # 8775352-2 ] filed by Attorney James N. Robinson for Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:43 PM]

Open Document #2

EXT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney James N. Robinson for Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:13 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney James N. Robinson for Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:21 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James N. Robinson for KK-PB Financial, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 04/15/2019 07:53 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eric Scott Pendergraft for 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:42 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bernice Cindy Lee for 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:41 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Philip Joseph Landau for 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:40 AM]

Open Document #3

District Court Order, DE # 36

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC [ # 8791424-2 ] filed by Attorney Philip Joseph Landau for Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 06/05/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION MOTION for Leave to File Limited Sur-Reply to Address New Matters Raised in Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC's Reply on its Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by KK-PB Financial, LLC. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8791424-1] [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 06/04/2019 08:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to response filed by Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 06/03/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to response filed by Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 06/03/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC [ # 8779388-2 ] filed by Attorney Philip Joseph Landau for Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 05/31/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion to dismiss appeal as moot filed by Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC [ # 8775352-2 ] filed by Attorney James N. Robinson for Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file response to motion filed by Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC is DENIED. [ # 8779390-2 ] WHP [Entered: 05/28/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. 5 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [5 VOLUMES] by Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC [ # 8779390-2 ] filed by Attorney Philip Joseph Landau for Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Eric Scott Pendergraft for Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11402] (ECF: Eric Pendergraft) [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney James N. Robinson for Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James N. Robinson for Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney James N. Robinson for Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney James N. Robinson for Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James N. Robinson for KK-PB Financial, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: James Robinson) [Entered: 04/15/2019 07:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eric Scott Pendergraft for 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bernice Cindy Lee for 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Philip Joseph Landau for 160 Royal Palm, LLC. [19-11402] (ECF: Philip Landau) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC on 04/10/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/25/2019 as to Appellant KK-PB Financial, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/09/2019 as to Appellee 160 Royal Palm, LLC [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.