This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2020 at 09:10:17 (UTC).

Kirby Ingram v. Louis Kubik, et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Kirby Ingram filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Louis Kubik,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11310

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KEVIN TURNER

LOUIS KUBIK

BLAKE DORNING

Plaintiff / Appellant

KIRBY INGRAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

George W. Royer Jr.

David J. Canupp

James Bentley Owens III

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Henry F. Sherrod III

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #2

Order Dismissing Case doc#49

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 05/29/2020 07:49 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2020

DocketAppellant's brief is currently due on 5/18/2020. Over the phone 28 day extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Henry F. Sherrod, III for Appellant Kirby Ingram. Appellant's brief is now due on 06/15/2020; Appendix due on 06/22/2020 as to Appellant Kirby Ingram. [Entered: 05/11/2020 03:05 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Grace Graham for Louis Kubik. [20-11310] (ECF: Grace Graham) [Entered: 04/22/2020 04:16 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by J. Bentley Owens, III for Louis Kubik. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11310] (ECF: Frank Ellis) [Entered: 04/17/2020 03:00 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney George W. Royer, Jr. for Appellees Blake Dorning and Kevin Turner. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11310] (ECF: George Royer) [Entered: 04/17/2020 11:05 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Louis Kubik James Bentley Owens, III for Louis Kubik. [20-11310] (ECF: James Owens) [Entered: 04/10/2020 02:38 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David J. Canupp for Blake Dorning and Kevin Turner. [20-11310] (ECF: David Canupp) [Entered: 04/10/2020 10:43 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George W. Royer, Jr. for Blake Dorning and Kevin Turner. [20-11310] (ECF: George Royer) [Entered: 04/10/2020 10:33 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Henry F. Sherrod, III for Appellant Kirby Ingram. [20-11310] (ECF: Henry Sherrod) [Entered: 04/09/2020 05:05 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11310] (ECF: Henry Sherrod) [Entered: 04/09/2020 05:01 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Henry F. Sherrod, III for Appellant Kirby Ingram. No hearings. [20-11310] (ECF: Henry Sherrod) [Entered: 04/09/2020 04:59 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2020

DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by. [20-11310] (ECF: Henry Sherrod) [Entered: 04/09/2020 03:53 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Henry F. Sherrod, III for Kirby Ingram. [20-11310] (ECF: Henry Sherrod) [Entered: 04/09/2020 03:49 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAppellate fee was paid on 04/06/2020 as to Appellant Kirby Ingram. [Entered: 04/08/2020 02:58 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Kirby Ingram on 04/06/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/18/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/20/2020 as to Appellant Kirby Ingram. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/04/2020 as to Appellees Blake Dorning and Louis Kubik [Entered: 04/08/2020 02:51 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less