This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 05:26:40 (UTC).

Kinney v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Kinney filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against HSBC Bank USA, N A. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-700

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARGARET L. KINNEY

Respondent

HSBC BANK USA, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Stephen Berken

Attorney at Joshua Sheade

1159 Delaware Street

Denver, CO 80204

Respondent Attorneys

Elizabeth S. Marcus

Attorney at Janeway Law Firm

9800 South Meridian Boulevard, Suite 400

Englewood, CO 80112

Lynn M. Janeway

9800 South Meridian Boulevard Suite 400

Englewood, CO 80112-0000

Jamie Grant Siler

Attorney at Murr Siler & Accomazzo

410 Seventeenth Street, Suite 2400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10714776] Response filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. to Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Compliance. Served on 01/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-700] JGS [Entered: 01/31/2020 04:58 PM]

Open Document

[10714773] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jamie Grant Siler for HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/31/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-700] [Entered: 01/31/2020 04:56 PM]

Open Document

[10712059] Motion filed by Petitioner Margaret L. Kinney to file motion out of time until 01/22/2020. Served on: 01/22/2020. Manner of service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-700] SB [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:02 PM]

Open Document #10

Order Denying Motion to Reconsider

Open Document #9

Judgment

Open Document #8

Order Dismissing Case

Open Document #7

Motion to Reconsider

Open Document #6

Order Dismissing Case

Open Document #5

Response to Motion to Dismiss

Open Document #4

Motion to Dismiss

Open Document #2

Chapter 13 Plan

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #5

Misc Docket Letter

Open Document #4

Judgment

Open Document #3

Order denying motion

Open Document #2

Order

Open Document #1

Petition for permission to appeal

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10714776] Response filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. to Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Compliance. Served on 01/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-700] JGS [Entered: 01/31/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10714773] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jamie Grant Siler for HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/31/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-700] [Entered: 01/31/2020 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket[10714766] Entry of appearance submitted by Jamie G. Siler for Respondent HSBC Bank USA, N.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-700] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 01/31/2020 by NA] JGS [Entered: 01/31/2020 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket[10712306] Minute order filed by Clerk of the Court response to motion to file motion out of time due on 01/31/2020 for HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. Served on 01/23/2020. Text only entry - no attachment. [20-700] [Entered: 01/23/2020 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712059] Motion filed by Petitioner Margaret L. Kinney to file motion out of time until 01/22/2020. Served on: 01/22/2020. Manner of service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-700] SB [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712018] Docketing statement filed by Margaret L. Kinney. Served on 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-700] SB [Entered: 01/22/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10711819] Case docketed. Petition for permission to appeal under 158(d) filed. Miscellaneous response due on 01/31/2020 for HSBC Bank USA, N.A. DATE RECEIVED: 01/21/2020. [20-700] [Entered: 01/22/2020 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.