This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/09/2020 at 05:41:09 (UTC).

Kingston Technology Company v. North Star Innovations, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 Kingston Technology Company filed an Other lawsuit against North Star Innovations, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1779

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

KINGSTON TECHNOLOGY COMPANY, INC.

Appellee

NORTH STAR INNOVATIONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Christopher Kao

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Appellee Attorney

Philip Levy

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor, Usx Tower

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/29/2020. [692740] Entry of Appearance is due 05/21/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/21/2020. Docketing Statement is due 05/21/2020. Certified List is due on 06/16/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 05/07/2020 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH STAR INNOVATIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KINGSTON TECHNOLOGY COMPANY INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant