This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:06:32 (UTC).

King Solarman, Inc. v. CIR

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 King Solarman, Inc filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CIR. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70373

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

KING SOLARMAN, INC.

Respondent / Appellee

COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Steven Ray Mather

Attorney at Mather Law Corporation

9777 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 805

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Gilbert Steven Rothenberg Esquire

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

William J. Wilkins

Attorney at INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

1111 Constitution Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20224

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant King Solarman, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/13/2020. [11596402] [20-70373] (Mather, Steven) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:50 AM]

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #5

Counsel Case Information Packet

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/13/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11596517]. [20-70373] (AD) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant King Solarman, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/13/2020. [11596402] [20-70373] (Mather, Steven) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant King Solarman, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/19/2020. Petitioner brief due 05/04/2020 for King Solarman, Inc.. Respondent brief due 06/01/2020 for Commissioner of Internal Revenue. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11594276] (HC) [Entered: 02/12/2020 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.