This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/15/2022 at 06:06:39 (UTC).

Kim Laurie, et al v. Charles Walder

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Kim Laurie, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Charles Walder. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-4192

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

KIM LAURIE

SETH MILLER

Defendant / Appellee

AUDITOR CHARLES WALDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jay Frederick Crook

Attorney at Law Offices

30601 Euclid Avenue

Wickliffe, OH 44092

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John T. McLandrich

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

Patricia Ambrose Rubright

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

Kathleen M. Minahan

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

Frank H. Scialdone

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller. Transcript needed: n. (MRL) [Entered: 12/17/2021 11:59 AM]

#3

(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/18/2022 at 2:00 pm EASTERN TIME with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 12/20/2021 01:44 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charles Walder by John T. McLandrich. Certificate of Service: 12/21/2021. [21-4192] (JTM) [Entered: 12/21/2021 03:12 PM]

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John T. McLandrich for Appellee Charles Walder Certificate of Service: 12/21/2021. [21-4192] (JTM) [Entered: 12/21/2021 03:13 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charles Walder by Frank H. Scialdone. Certificate of Service: 12/21/2021. [21-4192] (FHS) [Entered: 12/21/2021 03:20 PM]

#7

(#7) VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 01/27/2022 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 12/27/2021 08:09 AM]

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller by Jay F Crook. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2022. [21-4192] (JFC) [Entered: 01/06/2022 04:34 PM]

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Frederick Crook for Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller Certificate of Service: 01/06/2022. [21-4192] (JFC) [Entered: 01/06/2022 04:35 PM]

#13

(#13) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Frederick Crook for Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller.. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2022. [21-4192] (JFC) [Entered: 01/06/2022 04:35 PM]

#14

(#14) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/16/2022;. appellee brief due 03/18/2022; (MRL) [Entered: 01/07/2022 08:16 AM]

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charles Walder by Patricia Ambrose Rubright. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [21-4192] (PAR) [Entered: 01/21/2022 08:15 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • Docket(#16) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 01/27/2022 12:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charles Walder by Patricia Ambrose Rubright. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [21-4192] (PAR) [Entered: 01/21/2022 08:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/16/2022;. appellee brief due 03/18/2022; (MRL) [Entered: 01/07/2022 08:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Frederick Crook for Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller.. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2022. [21-4192] (JFC) [Entered: 01/06/2022 04:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Frederick Crook for Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller Certificate of Service: 01/06/2022. [21-4192] (JFC) [Entered: 01/06/2022 04:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller by Jay F Crook. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2022. [21-4192] (JFC) [Entered: 01/06/2022 04:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NATIVE PDF DOCUMENT SO FORM IS NOT MODIFIABLE***CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Frederick Crook for Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller.. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2022. [21-4192] (JFC) [Entered: 01/06/2022 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NATIVE PDF DOCUMENT SO FORM IS NOT MODIFIABLE***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jay Frederick Crook for Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller Certificate of Service: 01/06/2022. [21-4192] (JFC) [Entered: 01/06/2022 02:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NATIVE PDF DOCUMENT SO FORM IS NOT MODIFIABLE***APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller by Jay F. Crook. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2022. [21-4192] (JFC) [Entered: 01/06/2022 02:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 01/27/2022 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 12/27/2021 08:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charles Walder by Frank H. Scialdone. Certificate of Service: 12/21/2021. [21-4192] (FHS) [Entered: 12/21/2021 03:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John T. McLandrich for Appellee Charles Walder Certificate of Service: 12/21/2021. [21-4192] (JTM) [Entered: 12/21/2021 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charles Walder by John T. McLandrich. Certificate of Service: 12/21/2021. [21-4192] (JTM) [Entered: 12/21/2021 03:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/18/2022 at 2:00 pm EASTERN TIME with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 12/20/2021 01:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Michelle R. Lambert (MRL) [Entered: 12/17/2021 12:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Ms. Kim Laurie and Mr. Seth Miller. Transcript needed: n. (MRL) [Entered: 12/17/2021 11:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen M. Minahan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank H. Scialdone