This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/25/2021 at 06:11:49 (UTC).

Kim Allen, et al v. Hylands, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Kim Allen filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Hylands, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55289

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

YUANKE XU

MELISSA NIGH, on behalf of themselves, all others similarly situated, and the general public

DIANA SISTI

DANIEL XENOS

KIM ALLEN

NANCY RODRIGUEZ

SHERRELL SMITH

Defendant / Appellees

STANDARD HOMEOPATHIC COMPANY

HYLANDS, INC., a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Houchin

Attorney at Law Offices of Ronald A. Marron

651 Arroyo Drive

San Diego, CA 92103

Ronald A. Marron

Attorney at Law Offices of Ronald A. Marron

651 Arroyo Drive

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Yuchen Guo

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

555 S. Flower Street, 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jeffrey B. Margulies

Attorney at Fulbright & Jaworski LLP

555 South Flower Street, 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Spencer Stephen Persson Esquire

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • Docket(#9) Streamlined request [8] by Appellants Kim Allen, Melissa Nigh, Nancy Rodriguez, Diana Sisti, Sherrell Smith, Daniel Xenos and Yuanke Xu to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Kim Allen, Melissa Nigh, Nancy Rodriguez, Diana Sisti, Sherrell Smith, Daniel Xenos and Yuanke Xu opening brief due 06/23/2021. Appellees Hylands, Inc. and Standard Homeopathic Company answering brief due 07/23/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12118998] (JN) [Entered: 05/20/2021 07:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Kim Allen, Melissa Nigh, Nancy Rodriguez, Diana Sisti, Sherrell Smith, Daniel Xenos and Yuanke Xu. New requested due date is 06/23/2021. [12117613] [21-55289] (Houchin, Michael) [Entered: 05/19/2021 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator by email should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12099312] (VS) [Entered: 05/03/2021 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/30/2021, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 04/26/2021 ). [12086290] (VS) [Entered: 04/26/2021 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/26/2021, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 04/27/2021 ). [12073816] (VS) [Entered: 04/14/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/27/2021, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12073132] (VS) [Entered: 04/13/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/01/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12061335]. [21-55289] (AD) [Entered: 04/01/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Kim Allen, Melissa Nigh, Nancy Rodriguez, Diana Sisti, Sherrell Smith, Daniel Xenos and Yuanke Xu Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/01/2021. [12060810] [21-55289] (Marron, Ronald) [Entered: 04/01/2021 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Kim Allen, Melissa Nigh, Nancy Rodriguez, Diana Sisti, Sherrell Smith, Daniel Xenos and Yuanke Xu Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/02/2021. Appellants Kim Allen, Melissa Nigh, Nancy Rodriguez, Diana Sisti, Sherrell Smith, Daniel Xenos and Yuanke Xu opening brief due 05/24/2021. Appellees Hylands, Inc. and Standard Homeopathic Company answering brief due 06/23/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12054798] (JBS) [Entered: 03/26/2021 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANDARD HOMEOPATHIC COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Margulies

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spencer Persson