This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/28/2021 at 05:04:03 (UTC).

Killingbeck v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Killingbeck filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2687

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner

John C. Killingbeck

Ayer, MA 01432

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John C. Killingbeck

Attorney at Federal Medical Center

P.O. Box 879

Ayer, MA 01432

Respondent Attorney

Steven David Clymer

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

P.O. Box 7198, 100 South Clinton Street

Syracuse, NY 13261

 

Court Documents

#1

Motion FILED (c)

1 #2

1 #3

6 #1

Docketing_Notice_OP_cases

6 #2

Original Proceeding FILED

6 #3

Supporting Document

6 #4

Supporting Document

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3199928] [21-2687] [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:27 PM]

8 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

8 #2

Supporting Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent United States of America, FILED. Service date 10/27/2021 by US mail.[3200948] [21-2687] [Entered: 10/27/2021 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3199928] [21-2687] [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORIGINAL PROCEEDING, PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, on behalf of Petitioner John C. Killingbeck, FILED.[3200446] [21-2687] [Entered: 10/27/2021 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION, to file successive petition, on behalf of Petitioner John C. Killingbeck, FILED. Service date 10/22/2021 by US mail.[3199912] [21-2687] [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven David Clymer