This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/14/2021 at 06:13:37 (UTC).

Khanna v. Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Khanna filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-4185

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeevesh Khanna, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Plaintiff / Appellants

Insured Benefit Plans, Inc.

George Lehmann

Defendant / Appellees

Sam Backenroth

Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Irach Taraporewala

Jason Slakter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard W. Gonnello Esq.

Megan M. Remmel Esq.

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mary Weeks Esq.

Aurora Cassirer Esq.

 

Court Documents

#31

#28

#27

#20

#18

#17

#15

#13

#12

#11

#9

#7

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann Brief due date as 03/31/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 03/31/2021, FILED.[3012726] [20-4185] [Entered: 01/13/2021 02:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, informing Court of proposed due date 03/31/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 01/13/2021 by CM/ECF.[3012514] [20-4185] [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3009031] [20-4185] [Entered: 01/08/2021 08:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY, Megan M. Remmel for George Lehmann Insured Benefit Plans, Inc., in case 20-4185 , [ # 20 ], ADDED.[3007767] [20-4185] [Entered: 01/06/2021 05:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant George Lehmann and Insured Benefit Plans, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/06/2021 by CM/ECF. [3007716] [20-4185] [Entered: 01/06/2021 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 17 ], [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED.[3007694] [20-4185] [Entered: 01/06/2021 04:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 01/05/2021 by CM/ECF.[3006883] [20-4185] [Entered: 01/05/2021 06:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [14], on behalf of Appellants Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED.[3005705] [20-4185] [Entered: 01/05/2021 06:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY, Mary Weeks for Appellees Jason Slakter, Sam Backenroth, Irach Taraporewala and Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., in case 20-4185 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[3005703] [20-4185] [Entered: 01/05/2021 06:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Sam Backenroth, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jason Slakter and Irach Taraporewala, FILED. Service date 01/01/2021 by CM/ECF. [3004672] [20-4185] [Entered: 01/01/2021 11:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Sam Backenroth, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jason Slakter and Irach Taraporewala, FILED. Service date 12/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[3004043] [20-4185]--[Edited 01/04/2021 by TT] [Entered: 12/30/2020 02:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 12/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[3003961] [20-4185] [Entered: 12/30/2020 01:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 12/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[3003952] [20-4185] [Entered: 12/30/2020 01:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 12/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[3003935] [20-4185] [Entered: 12/30/2020 01:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY, Aurora Cassirer, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Mary Weeks, SUBSTITUTED.[3000719] [20-4185] [Entered: 12/28/2020 07:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Sam Backenroth, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jason Slakter and Irach Taraporewala, FILED. Service date 12/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [3000589] [20-4185] [Entered: 12/24/2020 10:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2997144] [20-4185] [Entered: 12/18/2020 06:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/16/2020, RECEIVED.[2997140] [20-4185] [Entered: 12/18/2020 06:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, district court receipt # ANYSDC23059112, FILED.[2997133] [20-4185] [Entered: 12/18/2020 06:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. [2997130] [20-4185] [Entered: 12/18/2020 06:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less