This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/22/2019 at 06:11:10 (UTC).

Khanna v. Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 Khanna filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3486

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeevesh Khanna, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Plaintiff / Appellants

Insured Benefit Plans, Inc.

George Lehmann

Defendant / Appellees

Sam Backenroth

Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Irach Taraporewala

Jason Slakter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard W. Gonnello Esq.

Dillon Hagius Esq.

Megan M. Sullivan Esq.

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Aurora Cassirer Esq.

Mary Weeks Esq.

 

Court Documents

#32

#29

#27

#26

20 #2

Proof of Service

20 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

19 #2

Proof of Service

19 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

#16

9 #2

Proof of Service

8 #2

Proof of Service

8 #1

Form C FILED

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann Brief due date as 02/05/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 02/05/2020, FILED.[2710303] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/19/2019 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant George Lehmann and Insured Benefit Plans, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 02/05/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 11/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2709948] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ATTORNEY, Mary Weeks for Jason Slakter Sam Backenroth Irach Taraporewala Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., in case 19-3486 , [ # 27 ], ADDED.[2705775] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/14/2019 08:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jason Slakter, Sam Backenroth and Irach Taraporewala, FILED. Service date 11/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2705682] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/13/2019 05:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[2702811] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/08/2019 04:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY, Dillon Hagius for Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc. Insured Benefit Plans, Inc., in case 19-3486, [ # 20 ], ADDED.[2701692] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ATTORNEY, Megan M. Sullivan for George Lehmann Insured Benefit Plans, Inc., in case 19-3486, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2701687] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 11/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2701645] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 11/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2701637] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CURED DEFECTIVE, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 16 ], on behalf of Appellee Sam Backenroth, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jason Slakter and Irach Taraporewala, FILED.[2701370] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellee Sam Backenroth, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jason Slakter and Irach Taraporewala, FILED.[2700425] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 08:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Sam Backenroth, Jason Slakter and Irach Taraporewala, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2700316] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/06/2019 06:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2700315] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/06/2019 06:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2700313] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/06/2019 06:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2700311] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/06/2019 06:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2687926] [19-3486] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17819095, FILED.[2687925] [19-3486] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/23/2019, RECEIVED.[2687923] [19-3486] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION & ORDER, dated 09/20/2019, RECEIVED.[2687920] [19-3486] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. [2687911] [19-3486] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less