This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/22/2019 at 06:11:10 (UTC).

Khanna v. Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 Khanna filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3486

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeevesh Khanna, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Plaintiff / Appellants

Insured Benefit Plans, Inc.

George Lehmann

Defendant / Appellees

Sam Backenroth

Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Irach Taraporewala

Jason Slakter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard W. Gonnello Esq.

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

685 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Dillon Hagius Esq.

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

685 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Megan M. Sullivan Esq.

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

685 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Aurora Cassirer Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

875 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Mary Weeks Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

600 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

#32

#29

#27

#26

20 #2

Proof of Service

20 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

19 #2

Proof of Service

19 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

#16

9 #2

Proof of Service

8 #2

Proof of Service

8 #1

Form C FILED

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann Brief due date as 02/05/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 02/05/2020, FILED.[2710303] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/19/2019 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant George Lehmann and Insured Benefit Plans, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 02/05/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 11/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2709948] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ATTORNEY, Mary Weeks for Jason Slakter Sam Backenroth Irach Taraporewala Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., in case 19-3486 , [ # 27 ], ADDED.[2705775] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/14/2019 08:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jason Slakter, Sam Backenroth and Irach Taraporewala, FILED. Service date 11/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2705682] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/13/2019 05:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[2702811] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/08/2019 04:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY, Dillon Hagius for Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc. Insured Benefit Plans, Inc., in case 19-3486, [ # 20 ], ADDED.[2701692] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ATTORNEY, Megan M. Sullivan for George Lehmann Insured Benefit Plans, Inc., in case 19-3486, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2701687] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 11/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2701645] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 11/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2701637] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CURED DEFECTIVE, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 16 ], on behalf of Appellee Sam Backenroth, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jason Slakter and Irach Taraporewala, FILED.[2701370] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellee Sam Backenroth, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jason Slakter and Irach Taraporewala, FILED.[2700425] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/07/2019 08:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Sam Backenroth, Jason Slakter and Irach Taraporewala, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2700316] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/06/2019 06:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2700315] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/06/2019 06:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2700313] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/06/2019 06:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2700311] [19-3486] [Entered: 11/06/2019 06:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2687926] [19-3486] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17819095, FILED.[2687925] [19-3486] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/23/2019, RECEIVED.[2687923] [19-3486] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION & ORDER, dated 09/20/2019, RECEIVED.[2687920] [19-3486] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Insured Benefit Plans, Inc. and George Lehmann, FILED. [2687911] [19-3486] [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less