This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2019 at 06:10:23 (UTC).

Khalase Mulligan v. Secretary, Department of Corr., et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Khalase Mulligan filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corr . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11025

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

KHALASE LE'TAVIAN MULLIGAN

Carrabelle, FL 32322

Respondent / Appellees

ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF FLORIDA

SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan

Attorney at Franklin CI - Inmate Legal Mail

1760 Hwy 67 N

Carrabelle, FL 32322

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Anne Catherine Conley

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

1515 N Flagler Dr Ste 900

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Thomas Howland Duffy

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

HAB-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Howland Duffy for Secretary [19-11025] (ECF: Thomas Duffy) [Entered: 04/02/2019 09:11 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Thomas Howland Duffy for Appellees Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11025] (ECF: Thomas Duffy) [Entered: 04/16/2019 09:38 AM]

Open Restricted Document #2

Motions Filed

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability to 05/30/2019 at 05:00 pm filed by Appellant Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8748342-1] [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:21 PM]

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/05/2019 06:02 PM]

Open Document #1

MOT-9 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:59 AM]

Open Document

Notice of Change of Address for Party Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:51 AM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for extension to file motion for COA filed by Appellant Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8748342-2 ] to 05/30/2019. [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:03 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

IFP-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #4

DC Judgement appealed Document No. 36

Open Document

USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan was filed on 02/13/2019. Docket Entry 35. [Entered: 03/25/2019 06:02 PM]

Open Document #3

DC Order appealed Document No. 35

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • Notice of filing Prisoner Financial Statement as to appellant. [Entered: 05/03/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8763380-1] [Entered: 05/03/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. [Entered: 04/22/2019 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file motion for COA filed by Appellant Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8748342-2 ] to 05/30/2019. [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Thomas Howland Duffy for Appellees Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11025] (ECF: Thomas Duffy) [Entered: 04/16/2019 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability to 05/30/2019 at 05:00 pm filed by Appellant Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8748342-1] [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8744000-1] [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address for Party Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/05/2019 06:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Howland Duffy for Secretary [19-11025] (ECF: Thomas Duffy) [Entered: 04/02/2019 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan was filed on 02/13/2019. Docket Entry 35. [Entered: 03/25/2019 06:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Khalase Le'Tavian Mulligan on 03/19/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 03/25/2019 05:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.