This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/23/2019 at 06:02:36 (UTC).

Keyes Law Firm, LLC v. Paul Napoli

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Keyes Law Firm, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Paul Napoli. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2174

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendants

LAW OFFICES OF NAPOLI BERN, LLP

NAPOLI BERN RIPKA SHKOLNIK & ASSOCIATES, LLP

PASTERNACK TILKER NAPOLI BERN LLP

NAPOLI SHKOLNIK & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

NAPOLI, KAISER, BERN & ASSOCIATES, LLP

LAW OFFICES OF NAPOLI BERN RIPKA SHKOLNIK LLP

LAW OFFICES OF NAPOLI BERN RIPKA SHKOLNIK & ASSOCIATES LLP

MARC JAY BERN

NAPOLI, BERN & ASSOCIATES, LLP

NAPOLI BERN, LLP

NAPOLI BERK RIPKA, LLP

MARC J. BERN & PARTNERS LLP

NAPOLI BERN RIPKA SHKOLNIK, LLP

LAW OFFICES OF NAPOLI BERN RIPKA & ASSOCIATES, LLP

NAPOLI BERN RIPKA & ASSOCIATES, LLP

Defendant / Appellants

NAPOLI SHKOLNIK PLLC

PAUL NAPOLI

PAUL NAPOLI LAW PLLC

NAPOLI LAW PLLC

Plaintiff / Appellee

KEYES LAW FIRM, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Eric Josh Pelletier

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN, PA

4800 Montgomery Lane

Bethesda, MD 20814

Harold Mark Walter

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN, PA

300 East Lombard Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Timothy Cronin Lynch

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN, PA

300 East Lombard Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Meghan K. Finnerty

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN, PA

300 East Lombard Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Meghan Katherine Finnerty

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN, P.A.

401 Plymouth Road

Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jean Evelyn Lewis

Attorney at KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA

1 South Street

Baltimore, MD 21202-0000

Andrew Jay Graham Esq.

Attorney at KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA

1 South Street

Baltimore, MD 21202-0000

Ezra S. Gollogly

Attorney at KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA

1 South Street

Baltimore, MD 21202-0000

Louis Paul Malick

Attorney at KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA

1 South Street

Baltimore, MD 21202-0000

 

Court Documents

#26

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

31 #2

Transcript order

31 #1

Transcript order acknowledgment

#30

#29

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#2

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER filed updating briefing schedule. Opening brief and appendix due 01/30/2020. Response brief due 02/27/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000636653] [19-2173, 19-2174] AW [Entered: 12/03/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William H. Pillsbury for Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates, LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern, LLP, Napoli Berk Ripka, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik, LLP, Napoli Bern, LLP, Napoli, Kaiser, Bern & Associates, LLP, Napoli, Bern & Associates, LLP and Pasternack Tilker Napoli Bern LLP in 19-2173. [1000635768] [19-2173, 19-2174] William Pillsbury [Entered: 12/02/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/30/2019. Response Brief due 01/27/2020 [19-2173, 19-2174] AW [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kayleigh T. Keilty for Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates, LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern, LLP, Napoli Berk Ripka, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik, LLP, Napoli Bern, LLP, Napoli, Bern & Associates, LLP, Napoli, Kaiser, Bern & Associates, LLP and Pasternack Tilker Napoli Bern LLP in 19-2173, Paul Napoli Law PLLC in 19-2174. [1000627035] [19-2173, 19-2174] Kayleigh Keilty [Entered: 11/15/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Paul Napoli in 19-2174. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000626522] [19-2173, 19-2174] Meghan Finnerty [Entered: 11/14/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Martin Giordano in 19-2173, 19-2174. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Show Cause Hearing- 05/09/2019. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates, LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern, LLP, Napoli Berk Ripka, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik, LLP, Napoli Bern, LLP, Napoli, Bern & Associates, LLP, Napoli, Kaiser, Bern & Associates, LLP and Pasternack Tilker Napoli Bern LLP . Originating case number: 1:17-cv-02972-RDB. Transcript due from Martin Giordano, Official Court Reporter on 01/21/2020. [19-2173, 19-2174] AW [Entered: 11/14/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates, LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern, LLP, Napoli Berk Ripka, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik, LLP, Napoli Bern, LLP, Napoli, Bern & Associates, LLP, Napoli, Kaiser, Bern & Associates, LLP and Pasternack Tilker Napoli Bern LLP in 19-2173 for. [19-2173, 19-2174] Michelle Lipkowitz [Entered: 11/14/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Paul Napoli re: filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Paul Napoli on 11/18/2019.. [19-2174] AW [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Paul Napoli Law PLLC in 19-2174. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000622586] [19-2173, 19-2174] Meghan Finnerty [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC in 19-2174. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000622583] [19-2173, 19-2174] Meghan Finnerty [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates, LLP in 19-2173. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000619588] [19-2173, 19-2174] Michelle Lipkowitz [Entered: 11/04/2019 08:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Napoli Berk Ripka, LLP in 19-2173. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000619586] [19-2173, 19-2174] Michelle Lipkowitz [Entered: 11/04/2019 08:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Law Offices of Napoli Bern, LLP in 19-2173. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000619585] [19-2173, 19-2174] Michelle Lipkowitz [Entered: 11/04/2019 08:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP in 19-2173. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000619584] [19-2173, 19-2174] Michelle Lipkowitz [Entered: 11/04/2019 08:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates LLP in 19-2173. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000619583] [19-2173, 19-2174] Michelle Lipkowitz [Entered: 11/04/2019 08:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates, LLP in 19-2173. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000619582] [19-2173, 19-2174] Michelle Lipkowitz [Entered: 11/04/2019 08:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michelle N. Lipkowitz for Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates, LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP, Law Offices of Napoli Bern, LLP, Napoli Berk Ripka, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik, LLP, Napoli Bern, LLP, Napoli, Bern & Associates, LLP, Pasternack Tilker Napoli Bern LLP and Napoli, Kaiser, Bern & Associates, LLP in 19-2173. [1000619575] [19-2173, 19-2174] Michelle Lipkowitz [Entered: 11/04/2019 07:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER filed consolidating case 19-2174 with 19-2173 (L). Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Meghan Finnerty, Esq., Timothy Lynch, Esq., Eric Pelletier, Esq., Harold Walter, Esq., Leland Shelton, Esq. [1000613607] [19-2173, 19-2174] AW [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:17-cv-02972-RDB. Mailed to: Meghan Finnerty, Esq., Timothy Lynch, Esq., Eric Pelletier, Esq., Harold Walter, Esq. [19-2174] AW [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-02972-RDB. Case manager: AWalker. [19-2174] AW [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAPOLI BERN RIPKA & ASSOCIATES, LLP is a litigant