This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:08 (UTC).

Kevin Tarpley v. Michael McMeade, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Kevin Tarpley filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Michael McMeade. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2476

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Kevin W. Tarpley

Licking, MO 65542-9069

Defendant / Appellees

Butler County Sheriff Department

Michael McMeade

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kevin W. Tarpley

Attorney at SOUTH CENTRAL CORRECTIONAL CENTER

255 W. Highway 32

Licking, MO 65542-9069

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Envelope

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 09/06/2019 [4816749] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:16 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/13/2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4808382] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:02 AM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Account Satement

Open Restricted Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Kevin W. Tarpley due 09/27/2019 [4830248] [19-2476] (EDG) [Entered: 09/13/2019 08:51 AM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis

Open Restricted Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 7/03/19, docket entries, Memo & Order 6/10/19, Order 6/10/19, Memo & Order 7/12/19. [4808377] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:57 AM]

Open Document

Prisoner case docketed. [4808365] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:48 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4808378] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:58 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Kevin W. Tarpley due 09/27/2019 [4830248] [19-2476] (EDG) [Entered: 09/13/2019 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Mr. Kevin W. Tarpley w/service by USCA8 on 08/14/2019. [4818948] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 08/14/2019 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 09/06/2019 [4816749] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Appellant Mr. Kevin W. Tarpley w/service by USCA8 on 08/07/2019. [4816476] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 08/07/2019 07:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/13/2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4808382] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4808378] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 7/03/19, docket entries, Memo & Order 6/10/19, Order 6/10/19, Memo & Order 7/12/19. [4808377] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4808365] [19-2476] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.