This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 06:07:04 (UTC).

Kevin Stanbridge v. Gregory Scott

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Kevin Stanbridge filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Gregory Scott. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1274

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

KEVIN W. STANBRIDGE

Rushville, IL 62681-0000

Respondent / Appellee

GREGORY SCOTT, Director, Rushville Treatment & Detention Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Kevin W. Stanbridge

Attorney at ILLINOIS DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

17019 County Farm Road

Rushville, IL 62681-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Michael L. Cebula

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

100 W. Randolph Street, State Of Illinois Center

Chicago, IL 60601-3218

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellee Gregory Scott. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 16-3642, 18-1726, 14-1548, 14-2114 [5] [6989512] [19-1274] (Cebula, Michael) [Entered: 03/08/2019 07:40 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Kevin W. Stanbridge leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 02/26/2019. [2] [6987047] [19-1274] (VG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:54 AM]

#1

State Habeas Corpus Case

#6

(#6) 1 copy Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Kevin W. Stanbridge. Disk not required. [6] [6993251] [19-1274] (CCG) [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:35 AM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#4

(#4) Appearance form filed by Attorney Michael L. Cebula for Appellee Gregory Scott. [4] [6987586] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1274]--[Edited 02/28/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Glick is termed and atty. Cebula is added to the docket.] (Cebula, Michael) [Entered: 02/28/2019 08:27 AM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Kevin W. Stanbridge. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 16-3642. [3] [6987241] [19-1274] (MM) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:51 PM]

1 #4

Fee Notice

1 #3

Notice to District Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) 1 copy Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Kevin W. Stanbridge. Disk not required. [6] [6993251] [19-1274] (CCG) [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellee Gregory Scott. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 16-3642, 18-1726, 14-1548, 14-2114 [5] [6989512] [19-1274] (Cebula, Michael) [Entered: 03/08/2019 07:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Appearance form filed by Attorney Michael L. Cebula for Appellee Gregory Scott. [4] [6987586] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1274]--[Edited 02/28/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Glick is termed and atty. Cebula is added to the docket.] (Cebula, Michael) [Entered: 02/28/2019 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Kevin W. Stanbridge. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 16-3642. [3] [6987241] [19-1274] (MM) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Kevin W. Stanbridge leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 02/26/2019. [2] [6987047] [19-1274] (VG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability pending. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 02/27/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Kevin W. Stanbridge by 02/13/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/27/2019 for Appellant Kevin W. Stanbridge. [1] [6984479] [19-1274] (AD) [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.