This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 17:53:25 (UTC).

Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. v. Christopher Gilbert

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 Kevin Snodgrass, Jr filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Christopher Gilbert. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6021

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

FLOYD W. MAPLES, Sergeant at ROSP

CURTIS PARR, Western Region Ombudsman VA. Dept. of Corrections

RED ONION'S MAILROOM STAFF

JOE FANNIN, Lieutenant at ROSP

STACY DAY, Lieutenant at ROSP

C. DEEL, Sergeant at ROSP

HAROLD CLARK, Head Director VADOC

J.B. MESSER, Grievance Coordinator at ROSP

Defendant / Appellees

GARRY ADAMS, Lieutenant at ROSP

WALTER SWINEY, Unit Manager at ROSP

A. GALLIHAR, Major/Chief of Housing and Program at ROSP

JOHN HAMILTON, Asst. Warden at ROSP

GERALD WASHINGTON, Central Classification Services VADOC

HENRY PONTON, Region Director-Western VADOC

AMEE DUNCAN, Counselor at ROSP

TORI RAIFORD, Unit Manager at ROSP

REANNE KEGLEY, Counselor at ROSP

CHRISTOPHER GILBERT

KELLY STEWART, Counselor at ROSP

Plaintiff / Appellant

KEVIN SNODGRASS, JR.

Big Stone Gap, VA 24219

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Laura Haeberle Cahill

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kevin Snodgrass Jr.

Attorney at WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON

P. O. Box 759

Big Stone Gap, VA 24219

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Kevin Snodgrass. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2019, Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6021] KH [Entered: 01/03/2019 12:01 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER filed [1000450089] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA. [6] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Kevin Snodgrass, Jr., #1203403. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Kevin Snodgrass Jr. WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON P. O. Box 759 Big Stone Gap, VA 24219 Warden Attn. Accounting Office WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON P. O. Box 759 Big Stone Gap, VA 24219. [19-6021] AB [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:32 PM]

#7

(#7) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. [19-6021] AB [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:30 PM]

#5

(#5) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. re: for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON P. O. Box 759 Big Stone Gap, VA 24219. [19-6021] KH [Entered: 01/31/2019 04:52 PM]

#2

(#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON P. O. Box 759 Big Stone Gap, VA 24219. [19-6021] KH [Entered: 01/03/2019 11:54 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:16-cv-00091-GEC-PMS. Case manager: KHancock. [19-6021] KH [Entered: 01/03/2019 11:19 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER filed [1000450089] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA. [6] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Kevin Snodgrass, Jr., #1203403. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Kevin Snodgrass Jr. WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON P. O. Box 759 Big Stone Gap, VA 24219 Warden Attn. Accounting Office WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON P. O. Box 759 Big Stone Gap, VA 24219. [19-6021] AB [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. [19-6021] AB [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • (#6) PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6021] AB [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. re: for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON P. O. Box 759 Big Stone Gap, VA 24219. [19-6021] KH [Entered: 01/31/2019 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • (#4) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 7:16-cv-00091-GEC-PMS. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6021] KH [Entered: 01/03/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Kevin Snodgrass. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2019, Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6021] KH [Entered: 01/03/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Kevin Snodgrass, Jr. WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON P. O. Box 759 Big Stone Gap, VA 24219. [19-6021] KH [Entered: 01/03/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:16-cv-00091-GEC-PMS. Case manager: KHancock. [19-6021] KH [Entered: 01/03/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.