This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/25/2021 at 06:10:57 (UTC).

Kevin Shelby v. Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Kevin Shelby filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15547

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

KEVIN M. SHELBY

Defendant / Appellee

BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING, INC., an Arizona corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joshua William Carden

Attorney at Joshua Carden Law Firm, P.C.

16427 N. Scottsdale Rd., Suite 410

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kimberly M. Shappley

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

2425 East Camelback Road

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Robert Shawn Oller Esquire

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

2425 East Camelback Road

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellant only, 04/29/2021, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12087902] (BLS) [Entered: 04/27/2021 09:24 AM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/26/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12069833] (BLS) [Entered: 04/09/2021 03:36 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Kevin M. Shelby Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12061975] [21-15547] (Carden, Joshua) [Entered: 04/02/2021 12:18 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellant only, 04/29/2021, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12087902] (BLS) [Entered: 04/27/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/26/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12069833] (BLS) [Entered: 04/09/2021 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Kimberly M. Shappley for party(s) Appellee Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., in case 21-15547. [12062113] (NAC) [Entered: 04/02/2021 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kimberly Marie Shappley (Littler Mendelson; 2425 E Camelback Rd., Suite 900, Phoenix, AZ 85016) for Appellee Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.. Date of service: 04/02/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12062103] [21-15547] (Shappley, Kimberly) [Entered: 04/02/2021 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/02/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12062021]. [21-15547] (AD) [Entered: 04/02/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Kevin M. Shelby Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12061975] [21-15547] (Carden, Joshua) [Entered: 04/02/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Kevin M. Shelby Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/02/2021. Transcript ordered by 04/26/2021. Transcript due 05/24/2021. Appellant Kevin M. Shelby opening brief due 07/06/2021. Appellee Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. answering brief due 08/05/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12054269] (JBS) [Entered: 03/26/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Marie Shappley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Shawn Oller