This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2019 at 06:06:05 (UTC).

Kevin Neal v. Harold Clarke

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 Kevin Neal filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Harold Clarke. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6190

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

HAROLD W. CLARKE, Director

Petitioner / Appellant

KEVIN L. NEAL

State Farm, VA 23160-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Eugene Paul Murphy

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Kevin L. Neal

Attorney at POWHATAN CORRECTIONAL CENTER

3600 Woods Way

State Farm, VA 23160-0000

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER filed [1000474003] deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Kevin L. Neal [ # 9 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Kevin Neal. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 03/12/2019 09:31 AM]

9 #2

envelope

9 #1

Account statement

8 #4

envelope

8 #3

Cover letter

8 #2

Pro Se appendix

8 #1

Informal opening brief (pro se cases, no paper copies required)

5 #2

IFP application

5 #1

Fee Notice

#3

(#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 02/19/2019. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:13 AM]

#2

(#2) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Kevin Neal. Informal Opening Brief due 03/01/2019. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:10 AM]

#1

(#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00278-TSE-MSN. Date notice of appeal filed: 01/24/2019. Case manager: CBennett. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 02/05/2019 10:56 AM]

4 #2

envelope

4 #1

MOTION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER filed [1000474003] deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Kevin L. Neal [ # 9 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Kevin Neal. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 03/12/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Kevin L. Neal. [19-6190]--[Edited 03/14/2019 by CB to include account statment.] CB [Entered: 03/12/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Kevin L. Neal. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 03/12/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • (#7) RECORD ON APPEAL filed (paper form). Record Part: State Court Records (Vols. I, II & III). Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00278-TSE-MSN. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 02/11/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • (#6) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00278-TSE-MSN. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case?N/A [19-6190] CB [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FEE NOTICE issued to Kevin L. Neal - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 03/11/2019. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00278-TSE-MSN. Mailed to: Kevin Neal. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 02/07/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 02/19/2019. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Kevin Neal. Informal Opening Brief due 03/01/2019. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00278-TSE-MSN. Date notice of appeal filed: 01/24/2019. Case manager: CBennett. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-6190] CB [Entered: 02/05/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Kevin L. Neal for certificate of appealability. Date and method of service: 01/31/2019 US mail. [1000453529] [19-6190] CB [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less