This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/15/2022 at 06:09:11 (UTC).

Kevin Cassaday v. Sparrow Health System, et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 Kevin Cassaday filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sparrow Health System. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1528

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

KEVIN WILLIAM CASSADAY

White Cloud, MI 49349-0000

Defendant / Appellees

SPARROW HEALTH SYSTEM

LANSING RADIOLOGY

UGAR TOEMET

GREAT LAKES CENTER OF RHEUMATOLOGY

MICHIGAN STATE UNIVERSITY

HENRY FORD ALLEGIANCE HEALTH, INC.

UNKNOWN PARTY, #1 named as Office Manager at Meridican Professional Psych.

WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN MEDICAL CENTER

COVENANT HEALTH

MIDMICHIGAN HEALTH, named as MID MI Health

ADAMS NEUROSURGERY, Mackinaw Ctr.

BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN

DANIEL LOEPP

REHAB ASSOCIATES OF MID MICHIGAN, named as Rehab Associates of MID MI

JOHN SZAJENKO

EPIC HEALTH INFORMATION PORTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kevin William Cassaday

Attorney at Newaygo County Jail

P.O. Box 845

White Cloud, MI 49349-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Kevin William Cassaday. Transcript needed: n. (MRL) [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:42 PM]

#4

(#4) Copy of District Court Order filed denying in forma pauperis filed June 30, 2022. (RGF) [Entered: 06/30/2022 11:41 AM]

5 #1

DC Denial With Time

5 #2

ruling letter sent

#6

(#6) Appellant MOTION filed by Kevin William Cassaday to remand case back to district court. Certificate of service: 07/05/2022. (MRL) [Entered: 07/11/2022 01:14 PM]

#7

(#7) Appellant MOTION filed by Kevin William Cassaday to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 07/05/2022. (MRL) [Entered: 07/11/2022 01:15 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Appellant MOTION filed by Kevin William Cassaday to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 07/05/2022. (MRL) [Entered: 07/11/2022 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Appellant MOTION filed by Kevin William Cassaday to remand case back to district court. Certificate of service: 07/05/2022. (MRL) [Entered: 07/11/2022 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee in the District Court or file a motion in this Court to proceed IFP on or before August 1, 2022. (RGF) [Entered: 06/30/2022 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Copy of District Court Order filed denying in forma pauperis filed June 30, 2022. (RGF) [Entered: 06/30/2022 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • Docket(#3) Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (MRL) [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Michelle R. Lambert (MRL) [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Kevin William Cassaday. Transcript needed: n. (MRL) [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Covenant Health Corp (TV1) is a litigant

Latest cases where The University of Michigan is a litigant

Latest cases where MICHIGAN STATE UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Minnesota is a litigant