This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/25/2022 at 06:09:50 (UTC).

Kevin Cassaday v. Daniel Loepp, et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Kevin Cassaday filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Daniel Loepp,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1118

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

KEVIN WILLIAM CASSADAY

White Cloud, MI 49349-0000

Defendant / Appellees

DANIEL LOEPP, CEO, in his individual capacity

BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kevin William Cassaday

Attorney at Newaygo County Jail

P.O. Box 845

White Cloud, MI 49349-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott R. Knapp

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

215 S. Washington Square, Suite 200

Lansing, MI 48933

Phillip J. DeRosier

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 4000

Detroit, MI 48226-3425

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Kevin William Cassaday. Transcript needed: n. (MRL) [Entered: 02/24/2022 11:23 AM]

4 #1

DC Denial With Time

4 #2

form(s) sent

5 #1

appeal letter

5 #2

NOA

6 #1

Cover Letter

6 #2

show cause order filed

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan and Mr. Daniel Loepp by Phillip J. DeRosier. Certificate of Service: 03/07/2022. [22-1118] (PJD) [Entered: 03/07/2022 05:08 PM]

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Phillip J. DeRosier for Appellees Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan and Mr. Daniel Loepp Certificate of Service: 03/08/2022. [22-1118] (PJD) [Entered: 03/08/2022 10:50 AM]

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Phillip J. DeRosier for Appellees Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan and Mr. Daniel Loepp Certificate of Service: 03/08/2022. [22-1118] (PJD) [Entered: 03/08/2022 10:50 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Phillip J. DeRosier for Appellees Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan and Mr. Daniel Loepp Certificate of Service: 03/08/2022. [22-1118] (PJD) [Entered: 03/08/2022 10:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Phillip J. DeRosier for Appellees Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan and Mr. Daniel Loepp Certificate of Service: 03/08/2022. [22-1118] (PJD) [Entered: 03/08/2022 10:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan and Mr. Daniel Loepp by Phillip J. DeRosier. Certificate of Service: 03/07/2022. [22-1118] (PJD) [Entered: 03/07/2022 05:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SHOW CAUSE order filed: It is therefore ordered that Cassaday show cause in writing not later than twenty-one days from the date of this order why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to comply with 28 U.S.C. 2107(a) and Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a). Response due by 03/28/2022 for Kevin William Cassaday. (MRL) [Entered: 03/07/2022 03:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Copy of Copy of appeal packet showing receipt date on NOA from distict court filed 2/24/22 RE#25 from district court filed. (MRL) [Entered: 03/02/2022 11:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. (MRL) [Entered: 02/24/2022 12:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#3) Update fee status change to ifp. (MRL) [Entered: 02/24/2022 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Michelle R. Lambert (MRL) [Entered: 02/24/2022 11:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Kevin William Cassaday. Transcript needed: n. (MRL) [Entered: 02/24/2022 11:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less