This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:24 (UTC).

Kevin Brooks v. Warden

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Kevin Brooks filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12658

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

WARDEN

Petitioner / Appellant

KEVIN BROOKS

Oglethorpe, GA 31068-0426

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Paula Khristian Smith

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Sq

Atlanta, GA 30334

Christopher Michael Carr

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Sq

Atlanta, GA 30334

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Kevin Brooks

Attorney at Macon SP - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 426

Oglethorpe, GA 31068-0426

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

HAB-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kevin Brooks. [Entered: 08/05/2019 05:29 PM]

Open Document #1

HAB-3 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

USDC Order Denying COA

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paula Khristian Smith for Warden. [19-12658] (ECF: Paula Smith) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:50 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Kevin Brooks. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8874133-1] [Entered: 09/09/2019 12:35 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kevin Brooks. [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:46 AM]

Open Document #3

Judgment in a Civil Case DC #21

Open Document #4

Order DC #20

Open Document #2

Notice of Filing

Open Document #5

Report amd Recommendation DC #14

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

MP-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Kevin Brooks. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8874133-1] [Entered: 09/09/2019 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of filing: Petitioner's request for case status dated August 30, 2019 as to Appellant Kevin Brooks. [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Kevin Brooks was filed on 08/22/2019. Docket Entry 26. [Entered: 08/23/2019 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Christopher Michael Carr for Warden and Paula Khristian Smith for Warden. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/14/2019 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kevin Brooks. [Entered: 08/05/2019 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kevin Brooks. [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paula Khristian Smith for Warden. [19-12658] (ECF: Paula Smith) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Kevin Brooks on 07/15/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less