This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/13/2022 at 06:02:13 (UTC).

Kevin Anderson v. Trans Union LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Kevin Anderson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Trans Union LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1074

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

KEVIN ANDERSON

Defendant / Appellees

TRANS UNION LLC

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dennis D. McCarty Esq.

Attorney at McCarty Law Firm

P.O. Box 111070

Carrollton, TX 75011

Gary Schafkopf Esq.

Attorney at Hopkins & Schafkopf

11 Bala Avenue

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

Matthew B. Weisberg Esq.

Attorney at Weisberg Law

7 South Morton Avenue

Morton, PA 19070

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Casey B. Green Esq.

Attorney at Sidkoff Pincus & Green

1101 Market Street, Suite 2700

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Kari A. Morrigan Esq.

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Camille R. Nicodemus Esq.

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Jason Skoczulek Roberts Esq.

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Eric M. Hurwitz Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

457 Haddonfield Road, Libertyview, Suite 100

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

Laura J. Persun Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

DC Order 12/13/21

1 #3

caption

1 #4

Standing Order

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) The plaintiff has appealed after one defendant was granted judgment of the pleadings. The claims against the other defendant were not adjudicated, however. Instead, they were staying pending arbitration proceedings. There may therefore be no final decision to appeal under 28 U.S.C. Section 1291. See generally Aluminum Co. of Am. v. Beazer E, Inc., 124 F.3d 551, 557 (3d Cir. 1997) ("[T]here is no final order if claims remain unresolved and their resolution is to occur in the district court."); see also Freeman v. Pittsburgh Glass Works, LLC, 709 F.3d 240, 246-49 (3d Cir. 2013). All parties must file written responses addressing this issue within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (TMM) [Entered: 01/12/2022 12:14 PM]

#4

(#4) ORDER (Clerk) The captioned appeals involve similar to those raised in three consolidated appeals that have already been fully briefed (Bibbs, Parke, and Samoura v. Trans Union LLC, Nos. 21-1350, 21-1527, and 21-1530). Merits briefing in the captioned appeals is STAYED until Bibbs, Parke, and Samoura have been resolved. After the Court issues its mandate in those appeals, this stay will be lifted and these appeals will proceed in an appropriate manner. If any party objects to staying these appeals , a motion seeking relief should be filed within fourteen days of this order. This stay applies only to merits briefing and not to the following obligations: fee payments, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.3(a); ordering transcripts, Fed. R. App. P. 10(b), 3d Cir. L.A.R. 11.1; filing case-opening forms, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1.1, 33.2; and entering appearances of counsel, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 46.2. Failure to timely comply with those obligations may result in dismissal. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 107.1, 107.2(a). Neither does this stay alter the parties' obligation to address this Court's jurisdiction in Nos. 22-1074 and 22-1075. Deadlines for those responses were set in prior orders and remain in effect. [21-2443, 22-1074, 21-3039, 21-3040, 21-3041, 22-1075] (TMM) [Entered: 01/12/2022 04:02 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Appellee(s) Trans Union, LLC. [22-1074] (CRN) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:21 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Trans Union LLC. [22-1074] (CRN) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:24 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew B. Weisberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Kevin Anderson. [22-1074] (MBW) [Entered: 01/25/2022 01:13 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Kevin Anderson advising this court that no transcripts are available. [22-1074] (MBW) [Entered: 01/25/2022 01:14 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Kevin Anderson. [22-1074] (MBW) [Entered: 01/25/2022 01:15 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Kevin Anderson. [22-1074] (MBW) [Entered: 01/25/2022 01:15 PM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Trans Union LLC to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 01/26/2022. [22-1074] (CRN) [Entered: 01/26/2022 12:00 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Kevin Anderson to clerk order, clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 01/26/2022. [22-1074] (MBW) [Entered: 01/26/2022 03:45 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Kevin Anderson to clerk order, clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 01/26/2022. [22-1074] (MBW) [Entered: 01/26/2022 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Trans Union LLC to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 01/26/2022. [22-1074] (CRN) [Entered: 01/26/2022 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Kevin Anderson. [22-1074] (MBW) [Entered: 01/25/2022 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Kevin Anderson. [22-1074] (MBW) [Entered: 01/25/2022 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Kevin Anderson advising this court that no transcripts are available. [22-1074] (MBW) [Entered: 01/25/2022 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew B. Weisberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Kevin Anderson. [22-1074] (MBW) [Entered: 01/25/2022 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docket(#7) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 01/21/2022. (TMM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Trans Union LLC. [22-1074] (CRN) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Appellee(s) Trans Union, LLC. [22-1074] (CRN) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER (Clerk) The captioned appeals involve similar to those raised in three consolidated appeals that have already been fully briefed (Bibbs, Parke, and Samoura v. Trans Union LLC, Nos. 21-1350, 21-1527, and 21-1530). Merits briefing in the captioned appeals is STAYED until Bibbs, Parke, and Samoura have been resolved. After the Court issues its mandate in those appeals, this stay will be lifted and these appeals will proceed in an appropriate manner. If any party objects to staying these appeals , a motion seeking relief should be filed within fourteen days of this order. This stay applies only to merits briefing and not to the following obligations: fee payments, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.3(a); ordering transcripts, Fed. R. App. P. 10(b), 3d Cir. L.A.R. 11.1; filing case-opening forms, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1.1, 33.2; and entering appearances of counsel, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 46.2. Failure to timely comply with those obligations may result in dismissal. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 107.1, 107.2(a). Neither does this stay alter the parties' obligation to address this Court's jurisdiction in Nos. 22-1074 and 22-1075. Deadlines for those responses were set in prior orders and remain in effect. [21-2443, 22-1074, 21-3039, 21-3040, 21-3041, 22-1075] (TMM) [Entered: 01/12/2022 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) The plaintiff has appealed after one defendant was granted judgment of the pleadings. The claims against the other defendant were not adjudicated, however. Instead, they were staying pending arbitration proceedings. There may therefore be no final decision to appeal under 28 U.S.C. Section 1291. See generally Aluminum Co. of Am. v. Beazer E, Inc., 124 F.3d 551, 557 (3d Cir. 1997) ("[T]here is no final order if claims remain unresolved and their resolution is to occur in the district court."); see also Freeman v. Pittsburgh Glass Works, LLC, 709 F.3d 240, 246-49 (3d Cir. 2013). All parties must file written responses addressing this issue within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (TMM) [Entered: 01/12/2022 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 01/12/2022 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Kevin Anderson in District Court No. 2-20-cv-05226. (TMM) [Entered: 01/12/2022 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Credit Acceptance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason S Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kari A Morrigan