This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/23/2021 at 17:31:58 (UTC).

Kesner v. Barron's, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Kesner filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Barron's, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-491

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

 

Party Details

Defendants

Teri Buhl

Barron's, Inc.

Defendant / Appellees

William "Bill" Alpert

Dow Jones & Company, Inc., DBA Barron's, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant

Harvey J. Kesner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Sandra Hauser Esq.

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Steven S. Biss Esq.

Attorney at Law Office of Steven S. Biss

300 West Main Street

Charlottesville, VA 22903

 

Court Documents

#24

#22

#18

#17

#14

#13

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/17/2021, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3090685] [21-491] [Entered: 04/30/2021 01:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER, [ # 8 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Harvey J. Kesner failure to pay fee, EFFECTIVE.[3079457] [21-491] [Entered: 04/16/2021 12:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[3079452] [21-491] [Entered: 04/16/2021 12:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee William Bill Alpert and Dow Jones & Company, Inc. Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 12 ] from the docket, FILED.[3079323] [21-491] [Entered: 04/16/2021 11:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee William Bill Alpert Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 11 ] from the docket, FILED.[3079312] [21-491] [Entered: 04/16/2021 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [12], on behalf of Appellee William "Bill" Alpert and Dow Jones & Company, Inc., FILED.[3067983] [21-491] [Entered: 04/01/2021 08:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellee William "Bill" Alpert and Dow Jones & Company, Inc., FILED.[3067975] [21-491] [Entered: 04/01/2021 08:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee William "Bill" Alpert and Dow Jones & Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/31/2021 by CM/ECF. [3067884] [21-491] [Entered: 03/31/2021 06:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee William "Bill" Alpert and Dow Jones & Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/31/2021 by CM/ECF.[3067883] [21-491] [Entered: 03/31/2021 06:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE, to Appellee William "Bill" Alpert and Dow Jones & Company, Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3058649] [21-491] [Entered: 03/17/2021 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, dated 03/17/2021, dismissing appeal by 03/31/2021, unless Appellant Harvey J. Kesner, submits the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[3058646] [21-491] [Entered: 03/17/2021 04:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER, dated 03/17/2021, dismissing appeal by 03/31/2021, unless Appellant Harvey J. Kesner, submits fee or moves to proceed in forma pauperis, FILED.[3058625] [21-491] [Entered: 03/17/2021 04:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER, dated 03/15/2021, dismissing appeal by 03/29/2021, unless Appellant Harvey J. Kesner, submits Form D, FILED.[3056328] [21-491] [Entered: 03/15/2021 03:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER, dated 03/15/2021, dismissing appeal by 03/29/2021, unless Appellant Harvey J. Kesner, submits Form C, FILED.[3056322] [21-491] [Entered: 03/15/2021 03:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#4) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Steven S. Biss, Esq. for Appellant Harvey J. Kesner, informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3047010] [21-491] [Entered: 03/02/2021 10:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3047000] [21-491] [Entered: 03/02/2021 10:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3046999] [21-491] [Entered: 03/02/2021 10:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Harvey J. Kesner, FILED. [3046976] [21-491] [Entered: 03/02/2021 09:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARRON, is a litigant

Latest cases where DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Scott Biss