This case was last updated from PACER on 05/21/2019 at 09:34:37 (UTC).

Kerry Boulton, et al v. US Tax Lien Association, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Kerry Boulton filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against US Tax Lien Association, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15526

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SAEN HIGGINS

US TAX LIEN ASSOCIATION, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company

Plaintiff / Appellants

LUCA ANGELUCCI

JEREMY ANDREWS

KERRY BOULTON

WILLIAM GAMBA

ANE MARIE LACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Anna M. He

Attorney at Enenstein Ribakoff Lavina & Pham

12121 Wilshire Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Teri T. Pham

Attorney at Enenstein Pham & Glass

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 840

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Jenna F. Karadbil

Attorney at Law Office of Jenna F. Karadbil, P.C.

40 Worth Street, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10013

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brian S. Carter

Attorney at Law Offices of Brian S. Carter

402 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

7 #1

Docketing Letter

#3

(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11248608] (LW) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:51 PM]

7 #2

Mediation Letter

#11

(#11) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11283583] (VS) [Entered: 05/01/2019 01:57 PM]

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#1

Docketing Letter

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 04/26/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11261101] (VS) [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:32 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jeremy Andrews, Luca Angelucci, Kerry Boulton, William Gamba and Ane Marie Lacy Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/07/2019. [11255293] [19-15526] (Carter, Brian) [Entered: 04/07/2019 06:41 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11283583] (VS) [Entered: 05/01/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • (#10) Added attorney Teri T. Pham for Saen Higgins US Tax Lien Association, LLC, in case 19-15526. [11282020] (RR) [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Teri Thuy Ngoc Pham for Appellees Saen Higgins and US Tax Lien Association, LLC. Date of service: 04/30/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11281761] [19-15526] (Pham, Teri) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • (#8) Attorney Anna M. He in 19-15526 substituted by Attorney Jenna F. Karadbil for US Tax Lien Association, LLC and Saen Higgins in 19-15526 [11266383] (LA) [Entered: 04/16/2019 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail returned on 04/15/2019 addressed to Anna M. He for US Tax Lien Association, LLC and Saen Higgins, re: 03/22/2019 case opening information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: Jenna F. Karadbil via CM/ECF per Representation Statement attached to Notice of Appeal. [11266382] (LA) [Entered: 04/16/2019 07:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 04/26/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11261101] (VS) [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/07/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11255294] (AD) [Entered: 04/07/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jeremy Andrews, Luca Angelucci, Kerry Boulton, William Gamba and Ane Marie Lacy Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/07/2019. [11255293] [19-15526] (Carter, Brian) [Entered: 04/07/2019 06:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11248608] (LW) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • (#2) Terminated Teri T. Pham for US Tax Lien Association, LLC and Saen Higgins in 19-15526 (Due to incorrect ECF account information). [11240565] (SLM) [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/29/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/22/2019. Transcript due 05/20/2019. Appellants Jeremy Andrews, Luca Angelucci, Kerry Boulton, William Gamba and Ane Marie Lacy opening brief due 07/01/2019. Appellees Saen Higgins and US Tax Lien Association, LLC answering brief due 08/01/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11239039] (RT) [Entered: 03/22/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less