This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2020 at 06:11:23 (UTC).

Kenny Blanc v. USA

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Kenny Blanc filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-13990

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff / Appellant

KENNY BLANC

Coleman, FL 33521-1033

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 Ne 4Th St

Miami, FL 33132

Scott Dion

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 Ne 4Th St

Miami, FL 33132

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kenny Blanc

Attorney at USP Coleman I - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 1033

Coleman, FL 33521-1033

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appellee's brief is currently due on 01/11/2020. Over the phone 28 day extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Emily M. Smachetti for Appellee USA. Appellee's brief is now due on 02/08/2021, with the appendix due 7 days later. [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:02 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: Appellants Motion for Supplemental with Authority, which is construed as a motion to supplement the record, is DENIED. [ # 9250521-2 ] BCG (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:20 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by Kenny Blanc. Service date: 12/07/2020 [20-13990] Attorney for Appellee: Dion - email; Attorney for Appellee: Smachetti - email; Attorney for Appellee: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida - email. [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:47 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kenny Blanc. [Entered: 12/02/2020 12:10 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to supplement the record construed from Motion for Supplemental with Authority filed by Appellant Kenny Blanc. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9250521-1] [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:20 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kenny Blanc. [Entered: 12/02/2020 11:50 AM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Kenny Blanc. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/23/2020. [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:09 PM]

Open Document

USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Kenny Blanc was filed on 11/13/2020. Docket Entry 30. [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:06 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kenny Blanc. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:19 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Scott Dion for USA Ariana Fajardo Orshan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13990] (ECF: Scott Dion) [Entered: 11/10/2020 02:57 PM]

Open Document

Supplemental Authority (entitled: Motion to Supplement with Authority Argument) filed by Appellant Kenny Blanc. Service date: 11/12/2020. [Entered: 11/12/2020 02:03 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Dion for USA [20-13990] (ECF: Scott Dion) [Entered: 11/06/2020 12:11 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [20-13990] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 10/30/2020 05:12 PM]

Open Document #3

DC Order Doc 25

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

HAB-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellee's brief is currently due on 01/11/2020. Over the phone 28 day extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Emily M. Smachetti for Appellee USA. Appellee's brief is now due on 02/08/2021, with the appendix due 7 days later. [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Appellants Motion for Supplemental with Authority, which is construed as a motion to supplement the record, is DENIED. [ # 9250521-2 ] BCG (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by Kenny Blanc. Service date: 12/07/2020 [20-13990] Attorney for Appellee: Dion - email; Attorney for Appellee: Smachetti - email; Attorney for Appellee: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida - email. [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kenny Blanc. [Entered: 12/02/2020 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to supplement the record construed from Motion for Supplemental with Authority filed by Appellant Kenny Blanc. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9250521-1] [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kenny Blanc. [Entered: 12/02/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Kenny Blanc. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/23/2020. [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Kenny Blanc was filed on 11/13/2020. Docket Entry 30. [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kenny Blanc. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Scott Dion for USA Ariana Fajardo Orshan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13990] (ECF: Scott Dion) [Entered: 11/10/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Authority (entitled: Motion to Supplement with Authority Argument) filed by Appellant Kenny Blanc. Service date: 11/12/2020. [Entered: 11/12/2020 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Dion for USA [20-13990] (ECF: Scott Dion) [Entered: 11/06/2020 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [20-13990] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 10/30/2020 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Kenny Blanc on 10/22/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 10/26/2020 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less