This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2019 at 06:09:51 (UTC).

Kenneth Woliner v. Kristen Summers, et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Kenneth Woliner filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kristen Summers. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11060

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KRISTEN SUMMERS

MARTHA SOFRONSKY

LUCY GEE

LOUISE WILHITE-ST. LAURENT

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH

STATE SURGEON

Plaintiff / Appellant

KENNETH WOLINER

Boca Raton, FL 33433

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James O. Williams Jr.

Attorney at Williams Leininger & Cosby, PA

11300 Us Hwy 1 Ste 300

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

Carri Leininger

Attorney at Williams Leininger & Cosby, PA

11300 Us Hwy 1 Ste 300

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

Christine Edwards Lamia

Attorney at Florida Department of Health

4052 Bald Cypress Way, Bin C65

Tallahassee, FL 32399-3265

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kenneth Woliner

23086 Island View Dr #6

Boca Raton, FL 33433

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

District Court Order, DE # 169

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Carri S. Leininger, Esq. for Summers, St. Laurent and Gee. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11060] (ECF: Carri Leininger) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:30 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Kenneth Woliner. No hearings. [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:01 AM]

Open Document #2

EXT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carri Leininger for Appellees, Summers, St. Laurent & Gee [19-11060] (ECF: Carri Leininger) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:46 PM]

Open Document

USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Kenneth Woliner was filed on 03/20/2019. Docket Entry 176. [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:02 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 05/29/2019 filed by Appellant Kenneth Woliner. Motion is Unopposed [8752062-1] [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:00 PM]

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document #4

District Court Judgment, DE # 171

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kenneth Woliner. [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:57 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kenneth Woliner. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:32 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Kenneth Woliner is GRANTED. [ # 8752062-2 ] Appellants brief due on 05/29/2019. BCG [Entered: 04/30/2019 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Carri Leininger for Kristen Summers, Louise Wilhite-St. Laurent and Lucy Gee and James O. Williams, Jr. for Kristen Summers, Louise Wilhite-St. Laurent, Lucy Gee and Martha Sofronsky. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carri Leininger for Appellees, Summers, St. Laurent & Gee [19-11060] (ECF: Carri Leininger) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Carri S. Leininger, Esq. for Summers, St. Laurent and Gee. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11060] (ECF: Carri Leininger) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 05/29/2019 filed by Appellant Kenneth Woliner. Motion is Unopposed [8752062-1] [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kenneth Woliner. [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to James O. Williams, Jr. for Kristen Summers, Louise Wilhite-St. Laurent, Lucy Gee and Martha Sofronsky. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/19/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kenneth Woliner. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Kenneth Woliner was filed on 03/20/2019. Docket Entry 176. [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Kenneth Woliner. No hearings. [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Kenneth Woliner on 03/20/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/29/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/03/2019 as to Appellant Kenneth Woliner. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/17/2019 as to Appellee Kristen Summers [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.