This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/09/2022 at 13:14:09 (UTC).

Kenneth Thompson, et al v. Gretchen Whitmer, et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Kenneth Thompson filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Gretchen Whitmer. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2602

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JONEIGH S. KHALDUN, in her official capacity as Chief Medical Executive and Chief Deputy Director for Health

JOSEPH GASPER, in his offical capacity as Director of the Michigan State Police

DANA NESSEL, in her official capacity as Michigan Attorney General

Plaintiff / Appellants

DAVID A. ARNDT

HAPPY LAW

DARLENE DOWLING THOMPSON

HAPPY LAWN, dba Linda F. Jackson

TRACY BOLLE

REX S. COOPER

ELOISE A. MCINTOSH

GAYLE L. GUTCHAK

JACK L. ELLIOTT

STEVE A. MCINTOSH

MARK L. DE YOUNG

ANN E. GULICK

SHAWN M. JACKSON

JEFFREY S. PRITCHARD

DEANNA K. LESLIE

ROGER E. RAYCRAFT, JR.

LINDA L. DUNN

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Elizabeth R. Husa

P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

Neil Anthony Giovanatti

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David J. Gilbert

Attorney at Law Office

306 E. Broadway Streetsuite 1

Mt. Pleasant, MI 48858

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) SUBMISSION ON BRIEFS date set for Thursday, January 13, 2022. (KSF) [Entered: 11/17/2021 11:51 AM]

#24

(#24) REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. David J. Gilbert for Appellants David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Tarver Consulting, Linda Lee Tarver, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters. Certificate of Service: 10/08/2021. [21-2602] (DJG) [Entered: 10/08/2021 02:03 PM]

#23

(#23) LETTER filed by Mr. David J. Gilbert for David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Tarver Consulting, Linda Lee Tarver, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters communicating dates of unavailability for oral argument: January 14th, and 26th 2022. Certificate of Service: 09/30/2021. [21-2602] (DJG) [Entered: 09/30/2021 02:20 PM]

#22

RESTRICTED

#21

(#21) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file REPLY brief [ # 20 ] filed by Mr. David J. Gilbert., setting reply brief deadline: reply brief due 10/08/2021. (RGF) [Entered: 09/28/2021 03:02 PM]

#20

(#20) MOTION filed by Mr. David J. Gilbert for David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Tarver Consulting, Linda Lee Tarver, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 09/28/2021. [21-2602] (DJG) [Entered: 09/28/2021 01:04 PM]

#19

(#19) APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Neil Anthony Giovanatti for Joseph Gasper, Garlin Gilchrist, II, Robert Gordon, Doctor Joneigh S. Khaldun, Dana Nessel and Gretchen Whitmer. Certificate of Service: 09/07/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-2602] (NAG) [Entered: 09/07/2021 10:42 AM]

#18

(#18) CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. David J. Gilbert for David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Tarver Consulting, Linda Lee Tarver, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters.. Certificate of Service: 08/17/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-2602] (DJG) [Entered: 08/17/2021 02:34 PM]

#17

#10

8 #4

Additional Document

8 #3

Additional Document

8 #1

appearance form

#7

#5

#4

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SUBMISSION ON BRIEFS date set for Thursday, January 13, 2022. (KSF) [Entered: 11/17/2021 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. David J. Gilbert for Appellants David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Tarver Consulting, Linda Lee Tarver, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters. Certificate of Service: 10/08/2021. [21-2602] (DJG) [Entered: 10/08/2021 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) LETTER filed by Mr. David J. Gilbert for David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Tarver Consulting, Linda Lee Tarver, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters communicating dates of unavailability for oral argument: January 14th, and 26th 2022. Certificate of Service: 09/30/2021. [21-2602] (DJG) [Entered: 09/30/2021 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ***ENTRY LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A LETTER OF UNAVAILABILITY INSTEAD OF ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT.*** Argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. David J. Gilbert for Appellants David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Tarver Consulting, Linda Lee Tarver, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters. Certificate of Service: 09/30/2021. [21-2602]--[Edited 09/30/2021 by KSF] (DJG) [Entered: 09/30/2021 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file REPLY brief [ # 20 ] filed by Mr. David J. Gilbert., setting reply brief deadline: reply brief due 10/08/2021. (RGF) [Entered: 09/28/2021 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION filed by Mr. David J. Gilbert for David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Tarver Consulting, Linda Lee Tarver, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 09/28/2021. [21-2602] (DJG) [Entered: 09/28/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Neil Anthony Giovanatti for Joseph Gasper, Garlin Gilchrist, II, Robert Gordon, Doctor Joneigh S. Khaldun, Dana Nessel and Gretchen Whitmer. Certificate of Service: 09/07/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-2602] (NAG) [Entered: 09/07/2021 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. David J. Gilbert for David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Tarver Consulting, Linda Lee Tarver, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters.. Certificate of Service: 08/17/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-2602] (DJG) [Entered: 08/17/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTIFICATION filed by Ms. Elizabeth R. Husa for Joseph Gasper, Garlin Gilchrist, II, Robert Gordon, Doctor Joneigh S. Khaldun, Dana Nessel and Gretchen Whitmer regarding Withdrawal of Attorney. Certificate of Service: 08/10/2021. [21-2602] (ERH) [Entered: 08/10/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. David J. Gilbert for Linda Lee Tarver, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Kenneth A. Thompson, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Mark L. De Young, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Ann E. Gulick, Robert L. Jeffords, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Shawn M. Jackson, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Happy Lawn, Melvin L. Johns, Linda L. Dunn, Krystyna Johns, Charise Spink, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, William E. Norris, Ivan Morse, Paul C. Leslie, Deanna K. Leslie, Tarver Consulting, Tracy Bolle, The Evening Post, LLC, Happy Law, Steve A. McIntosh, Eloise A. McIntosh, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Jack L. Elliott, Timothy R. Walters, Colton R. Walters, William Scott and Debora Scott because 1. Brief was filed incorrectly, should have filed as a appellant brief. 2. Record cites are not in compliance; please refrain from putting record cites as footnotes. 3. Designation of appellant relevant district court documents is not in compliance.. Corrected brief due: 08/17/2021. 4. Table of contents reads as follows on page 2 at top - Table of Contents...Error! Book mark not defined. 5. Statement regarding Oral argument does not count toward word count. Counsel advised to call the Court with any questions and review and follow the briefs checklist attached. (RGF) [Entered: 08/10/2021 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kenneth A. Thompson by David J. Gilbert. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2021. [21-2602] (DJG) [Entered: 06/29/2021 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. David J. Gilbert for David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Tarver Consulting, Linda Lee Tarver, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2021. [21-2602] (DJG) [Entered: 06/29/2021 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COUNSEL KINDLY ADVISED TO REFILE EACH DOCUMENTS SEPARATELY********Contact the Court with questions. APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kenneth A. Thompson by David J Gilbert. Certificate of Service: 06/28/2021. [21-2602]--[Edited 06/28/2021 by RGF] (DJG) [Entered: 06/28/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/09/2021;. appellee brief due 09/07/2021; (RGF) [Entered: 06/28/2021 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#6) Update fee status change to paid. Docket Text: RECEIPT: USCA appeal fee re [21] by attorney David J. Gilbert on behalf of plaintiffs David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr, Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr, Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Linda Lee Tarver, Tarver Consulting, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters, Timothy R. Walters in the amount of $505, receipt number AMIWDC-6461852 (jmw) (RGF) [Entered: 06/28/2021 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Joseph Gasper, Garlin Gilchrist, II, Robert Gordon, Doctor Joneigh S. Khaldun, Dana Nessel and Gretchen Whitmer by ELIZABETH R. HUSA. Certificate of Service: 06/16/2021. [21-2602] (ERH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Joseph Gasper, Garlin Gilchrist, II, Robert Gordon, Doctor Joneigh S. Khaldun, Dana Nessel and Gretchen Whitmer by Neil Giovanatti. Certificate of Service: 06/16/2021. [21-2602] (NAG) [Entered: 06/16/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LOCKED - COUNSEL KINDLY ADVISED TO REFILE AS NON MODIFIABLE DOCUMENT*********APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Joseph Gasper, Garlin Gilchrist, II, Robert Gordon, Doctor Joneigh S. Khaldun, Dana Nessel and Gretchen Whitmer by Neil Giovanatti. Certificate of Service: 06/15/2021. [21-2602]--[Edited 06/16/2021 by RGF] (NAG) [Entered: 06/16/2021 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 06/15/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants David A. Arndt, Doris S. Arndt, Tracy Bolle, Rex S. Cooper, Vickie L. Cooper, Mark L. De Young, Linda L. Dunn, Mr. Thomas Earl Dunn, Jack L. Elliott, Rodney D. Fater, Vicky L. Fater, Ann E. Gulick, Fredrick D. Gulick, Sr., Gayle L. Gutchak, Rory C. Gutchak, Happy Law, Happy Lawn, David Isaac, Julie Isaac, Shawn M. Jackson, Robert L. Jeffords, Krystyna Johns, Melvin L. Johns, Deanna K. Leslie, Paul C. Leslie, Eloise A. McIntosh, Steve A. McIntosh, Ivan Morse, William E. Norris, Jeffrey S. Pritchard, Elizabeth L. Raycraft, Roger E. Raycraft, Jr., Debora Scott, William Scott, Kenneth R. Spiegel, Charise Spink, Linda Lee Tarver, Tarver Consulting, The Evening Post, LLC, Darlene Dowling Thompson, Kenneth A. Thompson, Colton R. Walters and Timothy R. Walters. Transcript needed: n. (RGF) [Entered: 06/15/2021 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less