This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/19/2020 at 06:13:54 (UTC).

Kenneth Mabs, et al v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 Kenneth Mabs filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Celebrity Cruises, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-10645

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

TERRY MABS, Wife

CATHERINE BRICKER, Wife

RICK MICHALSON, Husband

KENNETH MABS, Husband

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Defendant / Appellees

CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.

SKY SAFARI TOURS, INC.

VACATION & TOUR CONSULTANTS (ST. KITTS), d.b.a. Kantours

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John Scarola

Attorney at Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart & Shipley, PA

2139 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

David P. Vitale Jr.

Attorney at Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart & Shipley, PA

2139 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Elise Sherr Allison

Attorney at Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart & Shipley, PA

2139 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

David Joseph Sales

Attorney at David J. Sales, PA

1857 Morrill St

Sarasota, FL 34236

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Russell M. Landy

Attorney at Damian & Valori, LLP

1000 Brickell Ave Ste 1020

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Noah D. Silverman

Attorney at Foreman Friedman, PA

2 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Jeffrey Eric Foreman

Attorney at Norwegian Cruise Line

7665 Corporate Ctn Dr

Miami, FL 33126

Catherine J. MacIvor

Attorney at Foreman Friedman, PA

2 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Spencer Burgess Price

Attorney at Hamilton Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Se 2Nd Ave Fl 12

Miami, FL 33131

Carlos Javier Chardon

Attorney at Hamilton Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Se 2Nd Ave Fl 12

Miami, FL 33131

Michael John Dono

Attorney at Hamilton Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Se 2Nd Ave Fl 12

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Appellant Appendix vol. 2

Open Document #1

Appellant Appendix vol. 1

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Appearance of Counsel Form

Open Document #1

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

USDC Order- Doc #100

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #72

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants Kenneth Mabs and Rick Michalson. 2 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 04/07/2020 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppendix filed [2 VOLUMES] by Appellants Kenneth Mabs and Rick Michalson. [20-10645] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 04/03/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 04/02/2020 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Joseph Sales for Appellants Kenneth Mabs and Rick Michalson. [Entered: 03/31/2020 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketORDER: Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Civil Appeal Statement filed by Appellants Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs, Rick Michalson and Catherine Bricker is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9029715-2 ] [Entered: 03/31/2020 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Kenneth Mabs and Rick Michalson. [Entered: 04/03/2020 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by Kenneth Mabs and Rick Michalson. [20-10645] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 03/27/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Catherine J. MacIvor for Appellee Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10645] (ECF: Catherine MacIvor) [Entered: 03/12/2020 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael John Dono for Appellees Sky Safari Tours, Inc. and Vacation & Tour Consultants (St. Kitts). On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10645] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 03/11/2020 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement form Out of Time filed by Catherine Bricker, Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs and Rick Michalson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9029715-1] [20-10645]--[Edited 03/11/2020 by TLR to add the correct relief] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 03/09/2020 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Noah Silverman for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. [20-10645] (ECF: Noah Silverman) [Entered: 03/04/2020 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Catherine J. MacIvor for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. [20-10645] (ECF: Catherine MacIvor) [Entered: 03/04/2020 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Joseph Sales for Catherine Bricker, Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs and Rick Michalson. [20-10645] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael John Dono for Appellees Vacation and Tours Consultants (St. Kitts) Ltd. and Sky Safari Tours, Inc. [20-10645] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 03/04/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to David Joseph Sales for Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs, Rick Michalson and Catherine Bricker. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, David Joseph Sales for Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs, Rick Michalson and Catherine Bricker is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. Additionally, your appearance of counsel form must be submitted using the 11th Circuit Appearance of Counsel Form. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed and the Appearance of Counsel is resubmited utilizing the 11th Circuit form. [Entered: 03/03/2020 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by David J. Sales on behalf of Appellants, Catherine Bricker, Rick Michalson, Kenneth Mabs and Terry Mabs. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10645] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David J. Sales representing Appellants, Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs, Catherine Bricker, and Rick Michalson [20-10645] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 02/19/2020 as to Appellant Catherine Bricker. [Entered: 02/21/2020 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Catherine Bricker, Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs and Rick Michalson on 02/19/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/30/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/04/2020 as to Appellant Catherine Bricker. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/18/2020 as to Appellees Celebrity Cruises, Inc. and Sky Safari Tours, Inc. [Entered: 02/21/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vacation & Tour Consultants (St.Kitts) is a litigant

Latest cases where Celebrity Cruises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant