This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2019 at 06:11:17 (UTC).

Kenneth Gearhart v. Secretary, Department of Corr.

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Kenneth Gearhart filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11561

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

KENNETH G. GEARHART

Havana, FL 32333

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Respondent / Appellee

SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Kenneth G. Gearhart

Attorney at Gadsden Re-Entry Center

540 Opportunity Ln

Havana, FL 32333

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Mark J. Hiers

Attorney at Florida Commission on Offender Review

4070 Esplanade Way

Tallahassee, FL 32399-2450

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Beverly B. Brewster

Attorney at Florida Department of Corrections

501 S Calhoun St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Daniel Reeves Burke

Attorney at Florida Department of Corrections

501 S Calhoun St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

HAB-3 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

USDC Order or Motion on IFP

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kenneth G. Gearhart. [Entered: 05/28/2019 05:18 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Kenneth G. Gearhart. No hearings. [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:58 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kenneth G. Gearhart. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:44 PM]

Open Document #2

PRO-3 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Motion or Document Returned Unfiled

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel Reeves Burke for Appellee Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11561] (ECF: Daniel Burke) [Entered: 05/08/2019 08:46 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mark J. Hiers for Not Party Service. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11561] (ECF: Mark Hiers) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:42 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark J. Hiers for Service. [19-11561] (ECF: Mark Hiers) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:41 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel R. Burke for Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections Beverly B. Brewster for Secretary, Department of Corrections. [19-11561] (ECF: Daniel Burke) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:13 PM]

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Kenneth G. Gearhart was filed on 02/26/2019. Docket Entry 22. [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:45 AM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #22

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Kenneth G. Gearhart was filed on 05/28/2019. Docket Entry 32. [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kenneth G. Gearhart. [Entered: 05/28/2019 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Kenneth G. Gearhart. No hearings. [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kenneth G. Gearhart. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED UNFILED: Appellant's premature brief filed by Kenneth G. Gearhart is returned unfiled because a certificate of appealability has not been granted yet. You cannot file a brief until the court tells you what issues may be discussed in the brief. Also a motion for IFP is pending which stays the briefing schedule. Please do not send a brief until a briefing schedule issues. See 11th Cir.R. 31-1(b). See enclosed blue instructions (Table of Contents and Table of Citations is required) [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel Reeves Burke for Appellee Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11561] (ECF: Daniel Burke) [Entered: 05/08/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mark J. Hiers for Not Party Service. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11561] (ECF: Mark Hiers) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark J. Hiers for Service. [19-11561] (ECF: Mark Hiers) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel R. Burke for Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections Beverly B. Brewster for Secretary, Department of Corrections. [19-11561] (ECF: Daniel Burke) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Kenneth G. Gearhart was filed on 02/26/2019. Docket Entry 22. [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Kenneth G. Gearhart on 04/23/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.