This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:34 (UTC).

Kendrick v. Vazquez-Mobley

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Kendrick filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Vazquez-Mobley. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2165

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

County of Monroe

D. Gonzalez, I.D. #772

E. Torres, I.D. #700

City of Rochester

Harnischfeger, I.D. #108

Rochester Police Department

J. Sitton, I.D. #288

Anne Chase

Howard Relin

Celorio, I.D. #159

Frank Fedele, (Inv.) I.D. #219

CJ Dominic, I.D. #255

Plaintiff / Appellant

James Dean Kendrick

White Deer, PA 17887

Defendant / Appellees

Officer Richard Schell, (Schill)

Sergeant Robert Mattick

Officer Marisol Vazquez-Mobley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

James Dean Kendrick

Attorney at United States Penitentiary

P.O. Box 3000

White Deer, PA 17887

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Tiffany H. Lee

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York

100 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, FILED. Service date 08/19/2019 by US mail.[2640727] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:10 PM]

#15

(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party James Dean Kendrick, FILED. Service date 08/19/2019 by US mail.[2640726] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:10 PM]

#12

(#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [9], on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623415] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:30 PM]

#11

(#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [8], [9], on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623413] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:27 PM]

#19

(#19) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, FILED. Service date 08/19/2019 by US mail.[2640734] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:16 PM]

18 #2

PLRA Authorization Form FILED (c)

18 #1

Warden_Notice_of_Prisoner_Authorization

#17

(#17) LETTER, dated 08/19/2019, on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, cover letter for documents received 08/23/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/19/2019 by US mail.[2640729] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:11 PM]

#14

(#14) NOTICE, Case Status, SENT.[2623427] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:37 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER, dated 08/01/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/22/2019, unless Appellant James Dean Kendrick, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623422] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:33 PM]

#10

(#10) LETTER, dated 07/28/2019, on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, informing court that the jail is on lockdown and that the Appellant could not serve the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and Form D-P as a result of that lockdown, RECEIVED. No service.[2623410] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:26 PM]

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Robert Mattick, Richard Schell and Marisol Vazquez-Mobley, FILED. Service date 07/28/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2618641] [19-2165] [Entered: 07/28/2019 01:22 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2611667] [19-2165] [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:16 PM]

#3

(#3) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2611664] [19-2165] [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:15 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2611662] [19-2165] [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:15 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and Form D-P, [ # 11 ], [ # 12 ], [ # 15 ], [ # 16 ], on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, FILED.[2640737] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, FILED. Service date 08/19/2019 by US mail.[2640734] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT AUTHORIZATION FORM, FILED. Service date 08/19/2019 by US mail.[2640730] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) LETTER, dated 08/19/2019, on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, cover letter for documents received 08/23/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/19/2019 by US mail.[2640729] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, FILED. Service date 08/19/2019 by US mail.[2640727] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party James Dean Kendrick, FILED. Service date 08/19/2019 by US mail.[2640726] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE, Case Status, SENT.[2623427] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER, dated 08/01/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/22/2019, unless Appellant James Dean Kendrick, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623422] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [9], on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623415] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [8], [9], on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623413] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER, dated 07/28/2019, on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, informing court that the jail is on lockdown and that the Appellant could not serve the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and Form D-P as a result of that lockdown, RECEIVED. No service.[2623410] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • (#9) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, FILED. No service.[2623408] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party James Dean Kendrick, FILED. No service.[2623407] [19-2165] [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Robert Mattick, Richard Schell and Marisol Vazquez-Mobley, FILED. Service date 07/28/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2618641] [19-2165] [Entered: 07/28/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2613230] [19-2165] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2611667] [19-2165] [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2611664] [19-2165] [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2611662] [19-2165] [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant James Dean Kendrick, FILED. [2611658] [19-2165] [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.