This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 06:17:58 (UTC).

Keith Thompson v. Merrick Garland

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Keith Thompson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Merrick Garland. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5146

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Keith I. Thompson

Defendant / Appellee

Merrick B. Garland, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Larry G. Ward

Attorney at L.G. Ward and Associates

217 Emerald Hill Drive

Fort Washington, MD 20744

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jane M. Lyons

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1910733] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1908708-2 ]; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1903952-3 ] APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/08/2021 [21-5146] [Entered: 08/18/2021 04:52 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1908708] to extend time to file motion to 10/08/2021 filed by Merrick B. Garland (Service Date: 08/02/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 496 words. [21-5146] (Lyons, Jane) [Entered: 08/02/2021 05:17 PM]

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1908272] submitted by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/29/2021 ] [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/29/2021 04:50 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1908261] filed by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/29/2021 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/29/2021 04:00 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1907801] filed by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/26/2021 ] [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/26/2021 09:01 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1907737] filed by Merrick B. Garland [Service Date: 07/26/2021 ] [21-5146] (Lyons, Jane) [Entered: 07/26/2021 03:39 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1907735] filed by AUSA Jane M. Lyons and co-counsel AUSA R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee Merrick B. Garland. [21-5146] (Lyons, Jane) [Entered: 07/26/2021 03:38 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1907598] filed by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/25/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/25/2021 02:07 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1907153] filed by Larry G. Ward on behalf of Appellant Keith I. Thompson. [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/20/2021 09:41 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1907152] filed by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/20/2021 ] [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/20/2021 09:38 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1907151] filed by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/20/2021 ] [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/20/2021 09:34 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1903952] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/09/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/26/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/26/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/26/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/09/2021 [21-5146] [Entered: 06/25/2021 01:36 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1903950] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 21-5146: Fee Paid] [21-5146] [Entered: 06/25/2021 01:35 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1903948] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01374-TJK filed by Keith I. Thompson. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5146. [21-5146] [Entered: 06/25/2021 01:34 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1910733] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1908708-2 ]; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1903952-3 ] APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/08/2021 [21-5146] [Entered: 08/18/2021 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1908708] to extend time to file motion to 10/08/2021 filed by Merrick B. Garland (Service Date: 08/02/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 496 words. [21-5146] (Lyons, Jane) [Entered: 08/02/2021 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1908272] submitted by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/29/2021 ] [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/29/2021 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1908261] filed by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/29/2021 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/29/2021 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1907801] filed by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/26/2021 ] [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/26/2021 09:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1907737] filed by Merrick B. Garland [Service Date: 07/26/2021 ] [21-5146] (Lyons, Jane) [Entered: 07/26/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1907735] filed by AUSA Jane M. Lyons and co-counsel AUSA R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee Merrick B. Garland. [21-5146] (Lyons, Jane) [Entered: 07/26/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1907598] filed by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/25/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/25/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1907153] filed by Larry G. Ward on behalf of Appellant Keith I. Thompson. [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/20/2021 09:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1907152] filed by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/20/2021 ] [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/20/2021 09:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1907151] filed by Keith I. Thompson [Service Date: 07/20/2021 ] [21-5146] (Ward, Larry) [Entered: 07/20/2021 09:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1903952] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/26/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/09/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/26/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/26/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/26/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/09/2021 [21-5146] [Entered: 06/25/2021 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [1903950] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 21-5146: Fee Paid] [21-5146] [Entered: 06/25/2021 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1903948] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01374-TJK filed by Keith I. Thompson. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5146. [21-5146] [Entered: 06/25/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-5146] [Entered: 06/25/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jane M. Lyons

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R. Craig Lawrence