This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/22/2020 at 05:27:31 (UTC).

KEI (Maine) Power Management v. FERC

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 KEI Maine Power Management filed an Other lawsuit against FERC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1303

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEI (Maine) Power Management III LLC

Respondent

Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Morgan M. Gerard Esquire

Charles R. Sensiba

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1856806] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 09/16/2020. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 09/16/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 09/16/2020. PETITIONER underlying decision due 09/16/2020. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 09/16/2020. PETITIONER procedural motions due 09/16/2020. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 10/01/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 09/16/2020. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 09/16/2020. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 10/01/2020. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 10/01/2020 [20-1303] [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1856804] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1856801-2 ] [20-1303] [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1856801] of a decision by federal agency filed by KEI (Maine) Power Management III LLC [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [20-1303] [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1303] [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less