This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/01/2021 at 06:49:36 (UTC).

Keenan Wilkins v. Barber, et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Keenan Wilkins filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Barber. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15361

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

CHRISTINE ESCOBAR

SPECIAL APPEARANCE

Defendant / Appellees

R. RECAREY, Chief Executive Officer

ANISE ADAMS, Chief Medical Executive

S. GATES

R. SINGH, Chief Physician

AHMID DREDAR, Dr.

MONSOUR, Dr.

BARBER, Dr.

Plaintiff / Appellant

KEENAN G. WILKINS, AKA Nerrah Brown

Stockton, CA 95213

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David Edward Kuchinsky Esquire

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Edgar Nield

Attorney at Nield Law Group

681 Encinitas Boulevard, Suite 315

Encinitas, CA 92024

Gabrielle DeSantis Nield Esquire

Attorney at Nield Law Group

681 Encinitas Boulevard, Suite 315

Encinitas, CA 92024

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Keenan G. Wilkins

Attorney at CHCF - CALIFORNIA HEALTH CARE FACILITY

P.O. Box 32290

Stockton, CA 95213

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 8 ] submitted by R. Singh, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The supplemental excerpts of record [ # 9 ] submitted by R. Singh, et al. are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12089594] (KT) [Entered: 04/28/2021 10:41 AM]

10 #2

Additional Document

10 #1

Main Document

#9

(#9) Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees R. Singh, Anise Adams, Ahmid Dredar, R. Recarey, Monsour and S. Gates. Date of service: 04/27/2021. [12088874] [21-15361] (Kuchinsky, David) [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:00 PM]

#8

(#8) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees R. Singh, Anise Adams, Ahmid Dredar, R. Recarey, Monsour and S. Gates. Date of service: 04/27/2021. [12088852] [21-15361] (Kuchinsky, David) [Entered: 04/27/2021 02:54 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant Keenan G. Wilkins motion to take judicial notice. Deficiencies: None.. [12057287] (JFF) [Entered: 03/29/2021 05:04 PM]

6 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

6 #1

Main Document

#3

(#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 03/16/2021. [Case Number 21-15361: Partially Paid] [12047559] (RL) [Entered: 03/19/2021 12:35 PM]

#2

Additional Document

2 #1

Main Document

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 8 ] submitted by R. Singh, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The supplemental excerpts of record [ # 9 ] submitted by R. Singh, et al. are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12089594] (KT) [Entered: 04/28/2021 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellee Barber joinder to brief [ # 8 ] submitted by Appellees R. Singh, Anise Adams, Ahmid Dredar, R. Recarey, Monsour and S. Gates. Date of service: 04/27/2021. [12089109] [21-15361] (Nield, Gabrielle) [Entered: 04/27/2021 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees R. Singh, Anise Adams, Ahmid Dredar, R. Recarey, Monsour and S. Gates. Date of service: 04/27/2021. [12088874] [21-15361] (Kuchinsky, David) [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees R. Singh, Anise Adams, Ahmid Dredar, R. Recarey, Monsour and S. Gates. Date of service: 04/27/2021. [12088852] [21-15361] (Kuchinsky, David) [Entered: 04/27/2021 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Appellant Keenan G. Wilkins motion to take judicial notice. Deficiencies: None.. [12057287] (JFF) [Entered: 03/29/2021 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12048089] (CKP) [Entered: 03/19/2021 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docket(#5) Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [12048049] (CKP) [Entered: 03/19/2021 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Keenan G. Wilkins opening brief of 10 pages (Informal: No). Served on 03/16/2021. [12047774] (LA) [Entered: 03/19/2021 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 03/16/2021. [Case Number 21-15361: Partially Paid] [12047559] (RL) [Entered: 03/19/2021 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): The appeal filed February 26, 2021 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The briefing schedule is established as follows: appellants opening brief is due March 30, 2021; appellees answering brief is due April 27, 2021; and appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The appeal and any motions pending at the time briefing is completed will be referred to the next available motions panel for disposition. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). A review of the district court docket reflects that appellant was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court, and that such permission has not been revoked to date. Consequently, appellants forma pauperis status continues in this court. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), however, appellant must pay the full amount of the filing and docketing fees for this appeal when funds are available in appellant's account. Consequently, within 21 days after the filing date of this order, appellant must complete and file with this court the enclosed authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellant's institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellant's trust fund account. These fees will continue to be collected regardless of the date or manner of disposition of this appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) and (e)(2). Appellant is not responsible for payment when the funds in appellants prison trust account total less than $10.00, but payments must resume when additional deposits are made or funds are otherwise available. Failure to file timely the opening brief will result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12023157] (CKP) [Entered: 03/03/2021 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction. C.R. 3-3. [12021706] (RT) [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARBER is a litigant