This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/04/2021 at 06:11:39 (UTC).

Keen Smith, Jr. v. DPS, et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Keen Smith, Jr filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against DPS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35835

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

KEEN L.A. SMITH, Jr.

Wasilla, AK 99623

Defendant / Appellees

DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

DEPARTMENT OF LAW

ALASKA COURT SYSTEM

DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Keen L.A. Smith Jr.

Attorney at GCCC - GOOSE CREEK CORRECTIONAL CENTER

22301 West Alsop Road

Wasilla, AK 99623

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Main Document

#2

Additional Document

2 #3

Additional Document

2 #4

Additional Document

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Keen L.A. Smith, Jr. motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [12269297] (JFF) [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:01 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Keen L.A. Smith, Jr. motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [12269297] (JFF) [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): The district court judgment was entered on the docket on August 27, 2021. Appellants notice of appeal from that judgment was dated September 26, 2021, but was not filed until October 4, 2021. Thus, the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after the entry of the judgment. See 28 U.S.C 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1). Because appellant is a pro se prisoner, however, the notice of appeal is deemed filed when it was delivered to prison authorities for forwarding to the court. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(c)(1); Houston v. Lack, 487 U.S. 266, 270 (1988). Accordingly, within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall file with this court a declaration or notarized statement attesting to the date on which the notice of appeal was deposited in the institutions internal mail system and whether first-class postage was prepaid, or otherwise show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(c)(1); Douglas v. Noelle, 567 F.3d 1103 (9th Cir. 2009). Briefing is suspended pending further order of this court. A review of this courts docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. The Clerk will serve a Form 33 Inmate Declaration of Timely Filing and a Form 4 financial affidavit on appellant along with this order. [12248433] (CKP) [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Keen L.A. Smith Jr. opening brief due 12/03/2021. [12247449] (JMR) [Entered: 10/05/2021 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Public Safety is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS REHAB. K.V.S.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Department Of Labor is a litigant