This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/23/2022 at 06:04:30 (UTC).

KDG, LLC v. City of Fort Dodge, Iowa

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 KDG, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against City of Fort Dodge, Iowa. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3711

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

KDG, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

City of Fort Dodge, Iowa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jacob W. Nelson

Attorney at SIMMONS & PERRINE

Suite 1200, 115 Third Street, S.E.

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401-1266

Roger W. Stone

Attorney at SIMMONS & PERRINE

Suite 1200, 115 Third Street, S.E.

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401-1266

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ryan Allen Kehm

Attorney at CRIMMINS & KEHM

706 First Avenue, N.

Fort Dodge, IA 50501

Mark Raphael Crimmins

Attorney at CRIMMINS & KEHM

706 First Avenue, N.

Fort Dodge, IA 50501

Mark R. Crimmins

706 First Avenue, N.

Fort Dodge, IA 50501

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [5101641] [21-3711] (CJO) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:39 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 10/25/2021, and Judgment 10/25/2021. [5101648] [21-3711] (CJO) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:48 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 01/03/2022. BRIEF OF APPELLANT KDG, LLC due 01/03/2022. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5101654] [21-3711] (CJO) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:52 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Roger W. Stone for Appellant KDG, LLC w/service 11/30/2021 [5102889] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 11/30/2021 02:06 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jacob W. Nelson for Appellant KDG, LLC w/service 11/30/2021 [5102891] [21-3711] (JWN) [Entered: 11/30/2021 02:08 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant KDG, LLC. - FOR CAL [5102895] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 11/30/2021 02:11 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant KDG, LLC. No Transcript[5102897] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 11/30/2021 02:12 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Mark R. Crimmins for Appellee City of Fort Dodge, Iowa w/service 12/01/2021 [5103611] [21-3711] (MRC) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:17 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Ryan A. Kehm for Appellee City of Fort Dodge, Iowa w/service 12/01/2021 [5103613] [21-3711] (MRC) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:19 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant KDG, LLC - Separate Appendix - w/service 12/08/2021 [5105859] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:47 AM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant KDG, LLC. w/service 12/08/2021 [5105861] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:48 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant KDG, LLC - w/service 12/08/2021. [5105863] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:49 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Mr. Roger W. Stone for Appellant KDG, LLC w/service 12/30/2021. [5112668] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 12/30/2021 09:53 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Roger W. Stone for Appellant KDG, LLC correcting [ # 5112668-2 ] motion to dismiss case filed by Attorney. [5112891] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 12/30/2021 01:59 PM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT FILED - The motion to dismiss [ # 5112668-2 ] is granted. The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [5113795] [21-3711] (NDG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 09:51 AM]

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED. [5113800] [21-3711] (NDG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 09:58 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [5113800] [21-3711] (NDG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - The motion to dismiss [ # 5112668-2 ] is granted. The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [5113795] [21-3711] (NDG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Roger W. Stone for Appellant KDG, LLC correcting [ # 5112668-2 ] motion to dismiss case filed by Attorney. [5112891] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 12/30/2021 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketOn December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions filed under Rule 27, certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion to dismiss case, [ # 5112668-2 ], submitted by Mr. Roger W. Stone in 21-3711 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [21-3711] (NDG) [Entered: 12/30/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Mr. Roger W. Stone for Appellant KDG, LLC w/service 12/30/2021. [5112668] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 12/30/2021 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant KDG, LLC - w/service 12/08/2021. [5105863] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant KDG, LLC. w/service 12/08/2021 [5105861] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant KDG, LLC - Separate Appendix - w/service 12/08/2021 [5105859] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Ryan A. Kehm for Appellee City of Fort Dodge, Iowa w/service 12/01/2021 [5103613] [21-3711] (MRC) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Mark R. Crimmins for Appellee City of Fort Dodge, Iowa w/service 12/01/2021 [5103611] [21-3711] (MRC) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant KDG, LLC. No Transcript[5102897] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 11/30/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant KDG, LLC. - FOR CAL [5102895] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 11/30/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jacob W. Nelson for Appellant KDG, LLC w/service 11/30/2021 [5102891] [21-3711] (JWN) [Entered: 11/30/2021 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Roger W. Stone for Appellant KDG, LLC w/service 11/30/2021 [5102889] [21-3711] (RWS) [Entered: 11/30/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 01/03/2022. BRIEF OF APPELLANT KDG, LLC due 01/03/2022. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5101654] [21-3711] (CJO) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 10/25/2021, and Judgment 10/25/2021. [5101648] [21-3711] (CJO) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5101641] [21-3711] (CJO) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.D.G., INC. is a litigant