This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/31/2020 at 06:05:03 (UTC).

KBC Asset Management NV v. DXC Technology Company

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 KBC Asset Management NV filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against DXC Technology Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1718

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF WARREN POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

J. MICHAEL LAWRIE

PAUL N. SALEH

DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellants

KBC ASSET MANAGEMENT NV

ARBEJDSMARKEDETS TILLAEGSPENSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stephen Paul Barry

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Margaret Allison Upshaw

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Melissa Arbus Sherry

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Kevin M. McDonough

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS

885 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022-0000

Jamie L. Wine

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS

885 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Aaron Samuel Book

Attorney at WEBSTER BOOK, LLP

300 North Washington Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

Lauren Amy Ormsbee

Attorney at BERNSTEIN, LITOWITZ, BERGER & GROSSMANN

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

John C. Browne

Attorney at BERNSTEIN, LITOWITZ, BERGER & GROSSMANN

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Jesse L. Jensen

Attorney at BERNSTEIN, LITOWITZ, BERGER & GROSSMANN

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DOCKETING STATEMENT by KBC Asset Management NV and Arbejdsmarkedets Tillgspension. [20-1718] Gregg Levin [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jesse L. Jensen for Arbejdsmarkedets Tillgspension. [1000776266] [20-1718] Jesse Jensen [Entered: 07/16/2020 12:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lauren A. Ormsbee for Arbejdsmarkedets Tillgspension. [1000776261] [20-1718] Lauren Ormsbee [Entered: 07/16/2020 12:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arbejdsmarkedets Tillgspension. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000776253] [20-1718]--[Edited 07/16/2020 by AW-duplicate] John Browne [Entered: 07/16/2020 12:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John C. Browne for Arbejdsmarkedets Tillgspension. [1000776252] [20-1718] John Browne [Entered: 07/16/2020 12:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arbejdsmarkedets Tillgspension. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000776235] [20-1718] Gregg Levin [Entered: 07/16/2020 12:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KBC Asset Management NV. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000776226] [20-1718] Gregg Levin [Entered: 07/16/2020 11:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Aaron Samuel Book for Arbejdsmarkedets Tillgspension and KBC Asset Management NV. [1000775767] [20-1718] Aaron Book [Entered: 07/15/2020 06:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paul N. Saleh. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000775766] [20-1718] Jamie Wine [Entered: 07/15/2020 06:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J. Michael Lawrie. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000775764] [20-1718] Jamie Wine [Entered: 07/15/2020 06:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Melissa Arbus Sherry for DXC Technology Company, J. Michael Lawrie and Paul N. Saleh. [1000775757] [20-1718] Melissa Sherry [Entered: 07/15/2020 06:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kevin M. McDonough for DXC Technology Company, J. Michael Lawrie and Paul N. Saleh. [1000775756] [20-1718] Kevin McDonough [Entered: 07/15/2020 06:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jamie L. Wine for DXC Technology Company, J. Michael Lawrie and Paul N. Saleh. [1000775755] [20-1718] Jamie Wine [Entered: 07/15/2020 06:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ] Number of days granted: 31. Opening brief and appendix due 09/11/2020. Response brief due 10/13/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices is required. Copies to all parties. [1000773128] [20-1718] AW [Entered: 07/13/2020 07:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/STIPULATION by KBC Asset Management NV and Arbejdsmarkedets Tillgspension to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until September 11, 2020. [20-1718] Gregg Levin [Entered: 07/10/2020 05:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher F. Moriarty for KBC Asset Management NV. [1000768723] [20-1718] Christopher Moriarty [Entered: 07/02/2020 05:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gregg S. Levin for KBC Asset Management NV. [1000768518] [20-1718] Gregg Levin [Entered: 07/02/2020 02:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Finch, Williams. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/11/2020. Response Brief due 09/10/2020 [20-1718] AW [Entered: 07/02/2020 07:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01599-AJT-MSN. Mailed to: Finch, Williams. [20-1718] AW [Entered: 07/02/2020 07:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01599-AJT-MSN. Case manager: AWalker. [20-1718] AW [Entered: 07/02/2020 07:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where KBC Asset Management N.V. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jesse L. Jensen