This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/22/2023 at 06:16:03 (UTC).

Kaweah Delta Health Care District, et al v. Alex Azar, II

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 Kaweah Delta Health Care District, filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Alex Azar, II. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-55157

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, DBA Kaweah Delta Medical Center

ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, DBA Antelope Valley Hospital

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

HEART HOSPITAL OF BK, LLC, DBA Bakersfield Heart Hospital

BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, DBA Beverly Hospital

CASA COLINA HOSPITAL AND CENTERS FOR HEALTHCARE, DBA Casa Colina Hospital

CHINESE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, DBA Chinese Hospital

CMCM, INC., DBA College Hospital Costa Mesa

CHLB, LLC, DBA College Medical Center

COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEM, DBA Community Memorial Hospital San Buenaventura

COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA

COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA, DBA Contra Costa Regional Medical Center

DAMERON HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, DBA Dameron Hospital

EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER

EL CAMINO HOSPITAL

CITY OF EL CENTRO, DBA El Centro Regional Medical Center

ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER

GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, a California Limited Partnership

SAN BENITO HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, DBA Hazel Hawkins Memorial Hospital

HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DBA Henry Mayo Newhall Hospital

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Lloyd A. Bookman Esquire

David Jacob Vernon Esquire

Other Attorneys

David Peters

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex M. Azar, II in 23-55157, Appellee Alex M. Azar, II in 23-55209 reply to response (motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, ). Date of service: 04/14/2023. [12695532] [23-55157, 23-55209] (Peters, David) [Entered: 04/14/2023 07:28 AM]

#17

(#17) Filed (ECF) Appellants American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation in 23-55209, Appellees American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation in 23-55157 response to motion ([ # 16 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 16 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 04/07/2023. [12691321] [23-55209, 23-55157] (Bookman, Lloyd) [Entered: 04/07/2023 12:34 PM]

#16

(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex M. Azar, II in 23-55157, Appellee Alex M. Azar, II in 23-55209 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 03/28/2023. [12683253] [23-55157, 23-55209] (Peters, David) [Entered: 03/28/2023 09:12 AM]

#15

(#15) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12678808] [23-55157, 23-55209] (CL) [Entered: 03/21/2023 03:09 PM]

#13

(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellants American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation in 23-55209, Appellees American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation in 23-55157 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/13/2023. [12673112] [23-55209, 23-55157] (Bookman, Lloyd) [Entered: 03/13/2023 03:14 PM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 03/14/2023, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12666296] (CL) [Entered: 03/02/2023 03:06 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellees American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/28/2023. [12663822] [23-55157] (Bookman, Lloyd) [Entered: 02/28/2023 01:29 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex M. Azar, II Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/23/2023. [12659543] [23-55157] (Peters, David) [Entered: 02/23/2023 09:26 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #2

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex M. Azar, II in 23-55157, Appellee Alex M. Azar, II in 23-55209 reply to response (motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, ). Date of service: 04/14/2023. [12695532] [23-55157, 23-55209] (Peters, David) [Entered: 04/14/2023 07:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed (ECF) Appellants American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation in 23-55209, Appellees American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation in 23-55157 response to motion ([ # 16 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 16 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 04/07/2023. [12691321] [23-55209, 23-55157] (Bookman, Lloyd) [Entered: 04/07/2023 12:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex M. Azar, II in 23-55157, Appellee Alex M. Azar, II in 23-55209 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 03/28/2023. [12683253] [23-55157, 23-55209] (Peters, David) [Entered: 03/28/2023 09:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12678808] [23-55157, 23-55209] (CL) [Entered: 03/21/2023 03:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Docket(#14) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/13/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12673326]. [23-55157] (AD) [Entered: 03/13/2023 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellants American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation in 23-55209, Appellees American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation in 23-55157 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/13/2023. [12673112] [23-55209, 23-55157] (Bookman, Lloyd) [Entered: 03/13/2023 03:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • Docket(#12) Added Attorney David Jacob Vernon for Appellees/Cross-Appellants Kaweah Delta Health Care District, et al., in cases 23-55157 and 23-55209. [12669093] [23-55157, 23-55209] (HH) [Entered: 03/07/2023 01:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David Jacob Vernon (Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, P.C., 401 9th Street, N.W., Suite 550, Washington, D.C. 20004) for Appellants American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation in 23-55209, Appellees American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation in 23-55157. Date of service: 03/07/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12668979] [23-55209, 23-55157] (Vernon, David) [Entered: 03/07/2023 11:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellants American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/14/2023. First cross appeal brief due 05/30/2023 for Alex M. Azar II. Second brief on cross appeal due 06/30/2023 for American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation. Third brief on cross appeal due 07/31/2023 for Alex M. Azar II. Optional cross appeal Reply brief is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [12668855] [23-55209, 23-55157] (RT) [Entered: 03/07/2023 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 03/14/2023, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12666296] (CL) [Entered: 03/02/2023 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Docket(#8) Added Plaintiff/Appellee County of Ventura. [12664713] (HH) [Entered: 03/01/2023 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • Docket(#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/28/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12664387]. [23-55157] (AD) [Entered: 02/28/2023 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellees American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Chinese Hospital Association, CHLB, LLC, City of El Centro, CMCM, Inc., Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, DHA, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/28/2023. [12663822] [23-55157] (Bookman, Lloyd) [Entered: 02/28/2023 01:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/23/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12659900]. [23-55157] (AD) [Entered: 02/23/2023 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex M. Azar, II Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/23/2023. [12659543] [23-55157] (Peters, David) [Entered: 02/23/2023 09:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Lisa Zeidner Marcus substituted by Attorney David Peters. [12658446] (RL) [Entered: 02/22/2023 10:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David L. Peters (Appellate Staff Civil Division, Room 7209 U.S. Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW Washington, DC 20530) for Appellant Alex M. Azar, II. Substitution for Attorney Lisa Zeidner Marcus, Esquire for Appellant Alex M. Azar, II. Date of service: 02/22/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12658438] [23-55157] (Peters, David) [Entered: 02/22/2023 10:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Alex M. Azar II Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/28/2023. Transcript ordered by 03/20/2023. Transcript due 04/18/2023. Appellant Alex M. Azar II opening brief due 05/30/2023. Appellees American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital, Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District and Watsonville Hospital Corporation answering brief due 06/27/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12657369] (JMR) [Entered: 02/21/2023 02:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less