Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2021 at 06:05:57 (UTC).

Kaufman v. Microsoft Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Kaufman filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Microsoft Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1634

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Cross Appellant

MICHAEL PHILIP KAUFMAN

Defendant / Appellant

MICROSOFT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Cross Appellant Attorneys

Ari Jason Jaffess

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174

Ronald Abramson

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Leah A. Edelman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

The Mcpherson Building, 901 15Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Ahmed Jamal Davis

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1000 Maine Avenue Sw

Washington, DC 20024

Tara Lauren Kurtis

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Jason W. Wolff

Attorney at Fish & Richardson

12860 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

John Stephen Goetz

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Excylyn Hardin-Smith

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Christina Jordan McCullough Esq.

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Dan L. Bagatell

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

3 Weatherby Road

Hanover, NH 03755

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting [ # 10 ] the motion. Microsoft's opening brief is due no later than July 8, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [765924] [LMS] [Entered: 03/31/2021 12:31 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION of Appellant Microsoft Corporation to extend the time to 07/08/2021 to file brief. Service: 03/26/2021 by email. [765214] [21-1634] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 03/26/2021 05:54 PM]

#9

(#9) Official caption revised to reflect Cross-Appeal 21-1691. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [758289] [KMH] [Entered: 02/24/2021 12:40 PM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Michael Philip Kaufman. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757741] [21-1634] [Ronald Abramson] [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:42 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Michael Philip Kaufman. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757739] [21-1634] [Ronald Abramson] [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:40 PM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Ronald Abramson; Ari Jason Jaffess as counsel for Appellee Michael Philip Kaufman. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757737] [21-1634] [Ronald Abramson] [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:38 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Microsoft Corporation. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757571] [21-1634] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:28 AM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Microsoft Corporation. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757570] [21-1634] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:26 AM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Dan L. Bagatell; Christina J. McCullough; Tara L. Kurtis; Ahmed J. Davis; Leah A. Edelman; Jason W. Wolff; John S. Goetz; Excylyn Hardin-Smith as counsel for Appellant Microsoft Corporation. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757568] [21-1634] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:24 AM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting [ # 10 ] the motion. Microsoft's opening brief is due no later than July 8, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [765924] [LMS] [Entered: 03/31/2021 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION of Appellant Microsoft Corporation to extend the time to 07/08/2021 to file brief. Service: 03/26/2021 by email. [765214] [21-1634] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 03/26/2021 05:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Official caption revised to reflect Cross-Appeal 21-1691. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [758289] [KMH] [Entered: 02/24/2021 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket(#8) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-1634 Lead with 21-1691 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [758287] [21-1634, 21-1691] [KMH] [Entered: 02/24/2021 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Michael Philip Kaufman. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757741] [21-1634] [Ronald Abramson] [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Michael Philip Kaufman. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757739] [21-1634] [Ronald Abramson] [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Ronald Abramson; Ari Jason Jaffess as counsel for Appellee Michael Philip Kaufman. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757737] [21-1634] [Ronald Abramson] [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Microsoft Corporation. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757571] [21-1634] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Microsoft Corporation. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757570] [21-1634] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Dan L. Bagatell; Christina J. McCullough; Tara L. Kurtis; Ahmed J. Davis; Leah A. Edelman; Jason W. Wolff; John S. Goetz; Excylyn Hardin-Smith as counsel for Appellant Microsoft Corporation. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. [757568] [21-1634] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/03/2021. [754418] Entry of Appearance is due 02/22/2021. Certificate of Interest is due 02/22/2021. Docketing Statement is due 02/22/2021. Appellant's brief is due 04/09/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 02/08/2021 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RONALD ABRAMSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARI JASON JAFFESS