This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/09/2022 at 06:03:34 (UTC).

Kathy Allen v. L3Harris Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 Kathy Allen filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against L3Harris Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1528

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Defendants

METLIFE

MERCER HEALTH BENEFITS ADMINISTRATION, LLC

LINCOLN HERITAGE LIFE INSURANCE CO.

Plaintiff / Appellants

KATHY R. ALLEN

Washington, DC 20019-6760

JAY K. ALLEN

Raleigh, NC 27610-2820

Defendant / Appellee

L3HARRIS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kathy R. Allen

26 55Th Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20019-6760

Jay K. Allen

2526 Poole Road

Raleigh, NC 27610-2820

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Savannah Marie Singletary

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, PC

8529 Six Forks Road

Raleigh, NC 27615

Michael Douglas McKnight

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, PC

8529 Six Forks Road

Raleigh, NC 27615

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00174-D. Case manager: CHalupa. [1001159987] [22-1528] CH [Entered: 05/10/2022 12:58 PM]

2 #1

Informal Briefing Order Pkg.

#2

form(s) sent

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael D. McKnight for L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. [1001164594] [22-1528] Savannah Singletary [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:41 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Savannah M. Singletary for L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. [1001164604] [22-1528] Savannah Singletary [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:48 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001164623] [22-1528] Savannah Singletary [Entered: 05/18/2022 05:01 PM]

#7

(#7) REPRESENTATION STATEMENT (FRAP 12) by Jay K. Allen and Kathy R. Allen. [1001165075] [22-1528] Jay Allen [Entered: 05/19/2022 01:15 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kathy R. Allen. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001165084] [22-1528] Jay Allen [Entered: 05/19/2022 01:21 PM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jay K. Allen. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001165089] [22-1528] Jay Allen [Entered: 05/19/2022 01:24 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION by Jay K. Allen and Kathy R. Allen to place case in abeyance.. Date and method of service: 05/19/2022 ecf. [1001165318] [22-1528] Jay Allen [Entered: 05/19/2022 04:53 PM]

#11

(#11) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Informal Opening Brief due 09/06/2022; administratively terminating Motion for abeyance [ # 10 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Allen. [1001165653] [22-1528] TF [Entered: 05/20/2022 12:23 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Informal Opening Brief due 09/06/2022; administratively terminating Motion for abeyance [ # 10 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Allen. [1001165653] [22-1528] TF [Entered: 05/20/2022 12:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Jay K. Allen and Kathy R. Allen to place case in abeyance.. Date and method of service: 05/19/2022 ecf. [1001165318] [22-1528] Jay Allen [Entered: 05/19/2022 04:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jay K. Allen. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001165089] [22-1528] Jay Allen [Entered: 05/19/2022 01:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kathy R. Allen. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001165084] [22-1528] Jay Allen [Entered: 05/19/2022 01:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPRESENTATION STATEMENT (FRAP 12) by Jay K. Allen and Kathy R. Allen. [1001165075] [22-1528] Jay Allen [Entered: 05/19/2022 01:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001164623] [22-1528] Savannah Singletary [Entered: 05/18/2022 05:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Savannah M. Singletary for L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. [1001164604] [22-1528] Savannah Singletary [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael D. McKnight for L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. [1001164594] [22-1528] Savannah Singletary [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#3) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00174-D. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001159994] [22-1528] CH [Entered: 05/10/2022 01:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Kathy Allen, Jay Allen. [1001159990] Informal Opening Brief due 06/03/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-1528] CH [Entered: 05/10/2022 01:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00174-D. Case manager: CHalupa. [1001159987] [22-1528] CH [Entered: 05/10/2022 12:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where L3HARRIS TECHNOLOGIES is a litigant

Latest cases where METLIFE INC is a litigant