This case was last updated from PACER on 06/17/2019 at 03:24:00 (UTC).

Kathleen Geisse, et al v. Bayer Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Kathleen Geisse filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bayer Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15778

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION

MERRY X-RAY CHEMICAL CORPORATION

BAYER PHARMA AG, FKA Bayer Schering Pharma AG

Plaintiff / Appellees

KATHLEEN GEISSE, Ph. D.

CURTIS ULLESEIT

LISA WEHLMANN

Defendant / Appellants

BAYER CORPORATION

BAYER HEALTHCARE, LLC

BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Curtis Brooks Cutter

Attorney at Cutter Law PC

401 Watt Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95864

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Rodney M. Hudson

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jennifer Greenblatt

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & BaumLLP

1 North Franklin St.

Chicago, IL 60606

Edward Dumoulin

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

564 W. Randolph Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SZ): The joint motion to consolidate these appeals (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ] in No. 19-15778) is granted. Appeal Nos. 19-15778, 19-15781, 19-15782, 19-15783, and 19-15784 are consolidated. The request to designate No. 19-15783 as lead case (contained within Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ] in No. 19-15778) is denied. The consolidated opening brief and excerpts of record are due July 25, 2019; the consolidated answering brief is due August 26, 2019; and the optional consolidated reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. In addition to any other issues that the parties wish to raise, the parties shall address the basis of this courts jurisdiction over the consolidated appeals in their briefing. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(d). [11321974] [19-15778, 19-15781, 19-15782, 19-15783, 19-15784] (JPD) [Entered: 06/06/2019 11:49 AM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11307958] [19-15778, 19-15781, 19-15782, 19-15783, 19-15784] (CL) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:05 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Healthcare, LLC Correspondence: Letter to Clerk re Circuit Rule 10-3.1(c) Notice. Date of service: 05/16/2019 [11300783] [19-15778] (Hudson, Rodney) [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:38 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Healthcare, LLC Joint Motion to consolidate cases 19:15783, 19-15778, 19-15781, 19-15782 and 19-15784. Date of service: 05/13/2019. [11295346] [19-15778] (Greenblatt, Jennifer) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:10 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 05/22/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedules remains in effect... [11290588] [19-15778, 19-15781, 19-15782, 19-15783, 19-15784] (CL) [Entered: 05/08/2019 11:24 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellees Kathleen Geisse, Ph. D., Curtis Ulleseit and Lisa Wehlmann Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/24/2019. [11276377] [19-15778] (Cutter, Curtis) [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:59 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Healthcare, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/24/2019. [11275691] [19-15778] (Greenblatt, Jennifer) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:00 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SZ): The joint motion to consolidate these appeals (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ] in No. 19-15778) is granted. Appeal Nos. 19-15778, 19-15781, 19-15782, 19-15783, and 19-15784 are consolidated. The request to designate No. 19-15783 as lead case (contained within Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ] in No. 19-15778) is denied. The consolidated opening brief and excerpts of record are due July 25, 2019; the consolidated answering brief is due August 26, 2019; and the optional consolidated reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. In addition to any other issues that the parties wish to raise, the parties shall address the basis of this courts jurisdiction over the consolidated appeals in their briefing. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(d). [11321974] [19-15778, 19-15781, 19-15782, 19-15783, 19-15784] (JPD) [Entered: 06/06/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11307958] [19-15778, 19-15781, 19-15782, 19-15783, 19-15784] (CL) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) Appellants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Healthcare, LLC Correspondence: Letter to Clerk re Circuit Rule 10-3.1(c) Notice. Date of service: 05/16/2019 [11300783] [19-15778] (Hudson, Rodney) [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • (#8) Added attorney Edward Dumoulin for Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Corporation, in case 19-15778. [11295384] (QDL) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Healthcare, LLC Joint Motion to consolidate cases 19:15783, 19-15778, 19-15781, 19-15782 and 19-15784. Date of service: 05/13/2019. [11295346] [19-15778] (Greenblatt, Jennifer) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Edward Dumoulin for Appellants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Healthcare, LLC. Date of service: 05/13/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11295271] [19-15778] (Dumoulin, Edward) [Entered: 05/13/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 05/22/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedules remains in effect... [11290588] [19-15778, 19-15781, 19-15782, 19-15783, 19-15784] (CL) [Entered: 05/08/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellees Kathleen Geisse, Ph. D., Curtis Ulleseit and Lisa Wehlmann Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/24/2019. [11276377] [19-15778] (Cutter, Curtis) [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/24/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11276373] (AD) [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Healthcare, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/24/2019. [11275691] [19-15778] (Greenblatt, Jennifer) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/24/2019. Transcript ordered by 05/16/2019. Transcript due 06/17/2019. Appellants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Healthcare, LLC opening brief due 07/25/2019. Appellees Kathleen Geisse, Curtis Ulleseit and Lisa Wehlmann answering brief due 08/26/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11267279] (JBS) [Entered: 04/17/2019 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less