This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/09/2021 at 06:13:47 (UTC).

Kasi Crawford v. Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Kasi Crawford filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11647

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

KASI JAMEELAH CRAWFORD

Defendant / Appellee

MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Marsha Williams Mignott

Attorney at The Mignott Law Group, LLC

4945 Presidents Way

Tucker, GA 30084

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Paul Barry Trainor

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, PC

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Jeffery Randolph Saxby

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, PC

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Pearson K. Cunningham

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, PC

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #17

Order, DE #33

Open Document #13

Order, DE #108

Open Document #6

Order, DE #254

Open Document #5

Order, DE #275

Open Document #4

Order, DE #283

Open Document #3

Judgment, DE #284

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Kasi Jameelah Crawford. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/03/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/25/2021 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11647] (ECF: Jeffery Saxby) [Entered: 06/07/2021 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul Barry Trainor for Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.. [21-11647] (ECF: Jeffery Saxby) [Entered: 06/02/2021 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffery Randolph Saxby for Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.. [21-11647] (ECF: Jeffery Saxby) [Entered: 06/02/2021 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 06/01/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Pearson K. Cunningham for Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. [21-11647] (ECF: Pearson Cunningham) [Entered: 05/28/2021 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Kasi Jameelah Crawford. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/28/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/24/2021 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 05/05/2021 as to Appellant Kasi Jameelah Crawford. [Entered: 05/24/2021 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Marsha Williams Mignott for Appellant Kasi Jameelah Crawford. [21-11647] (ECF: Marsha Mignott) [Entered: 05/24/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marsha Williams Mignott for Kasi Jameelah Crawford. [21-11647] (ECF: Marsha Mignott) [Entered: 05/24/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Marsha Williams Mignott for Appellant Kasi Jameelah Crawford. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11647] (ECF: Marsha Mignott) [Entered: 05/24/2021 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Kasi Jameelah Crawford on 05/05/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/24/2021 as to Appellant Kasi Jameelah Crawford. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/07/2021 as to Appellee Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. [Entered: 05/17/2021 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffery Randolph Saxby

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEARSON K CUNNINGHAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Barry Trainor