Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2020 at 06:09:35 (UTC).

Karen Schulte v. Conopco, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 Karen Schulte filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Conopco, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2696

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Does 1-10

Walgreen Co.

Defendant / Appellees

Schnuck Markets, Inc.

Target Corporation

Walmart, Inc.

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Dierbergs Markets, Inc.

Conopco, Inc., doing business as Unilever

Plaintiff / Appellant

Karen Schulte, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James Patrick Muehlberger

Attorney at SHOOK & HARDY

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Christopher R. Wray

Attorney at SHOOK & HARDY

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Troy Bozarth

Attorney at HEPLER & BROOM

Suite 2700, 211 N. Broadway

Saint Louis, MO 63102

Darci Faulkner Madden

Attorney at BRYAN & CAVE

3600 One Metropolitan Square, 211 N. Broadway

Saint Louis, MO 63102-2186

Ann Elizabeth Sternhell Blackwell

Attorney at BRYAN & CAVE

3600 One Metropolitan Square, 211 N. Broadway

Saint Louis, MO 63102-2186

LaDawn L. Burnett

Attorney at BRYAN & CAVE

3600 One Metropolitan Square, 211 N. Broadway

Saint Louis, MO 63102-2186

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Daniel F. Harvath

Attorney at HARVATH LAW GROUP

Suite 1, 75 W. Lockwood

Webster Groves, MO 63119

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4956734-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. James Patrick Muehlberger. Brief(s) of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Conopco, Dierbergs Markets, Schnuck Markets, Target Corporation and Walmart, Inc. due 11/04/2020. [4956965] [20-2696] (BNW) [Entered: 09/17/2020 04:24 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. James Patrick Muehlberger for Appellees Conopco, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Dierbergs Markets and Schnuck Markets correcting [ # 4956734-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Attorney. [4956946] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 09/17/2020 03:56 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/04/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. James Patrick Muehlberger for Appellees Conopco, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Dierbergs Markets and Schnuck Markets w/service 09/17/2020. [4956734] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:38 AM]

Open Document

CORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for Paper Brief, Doc No. [ # 4954387-2 ], filed by Appellant Ms. Karen Schulte [4955095] [20-2696] (DFH) [Entered: 09/13/2020 04:07 PM]

Open Document

CORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for Court Record, Doc No. [ # 4954404-2 ], filed by Appellant Ms. Karen Schulte [4955094] [20-2696] (DFH) [Entered: 09/13/2020 04:03 PM]

Open Document

RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volume, Comments: 3 copies Record Deficiency due on 09/15/2020. SEE ATTACHED NOTICE. [4954404] [20-2696] (CRJ) [Entered: 09/10/2020 01:59 PM]

Open Document

Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4952440-2 ] filed by Ms. Karen Schulte 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached Paper brief deficiency due 09/15/2020. SEE ATTACHED NOTICE. [4954387] [20-2696] (CRJ) [Entered: 09/10/2020 01:45 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Karen Schulte w/service 09/03/2020. Length: 12,849 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Karen Schulte due 09/08/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief(s) of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Conopco, Dierbergs Markets, Schnuck Markets, Target Corporation and Walmart, Inc. due on 10/05/2020. [4952440] [20-2696] (BNW) [Entered: 09/03/2020 02:36 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Christopher R. Wray for Appellees Conopco, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Dierbergs Markets and Schnuck Markets w/service 08/20/2020 [4947242] [20-2696] (CRW) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:39 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Schnuck Markets. - FOR CAL [4947239] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:36 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4947238] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:33 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Dierbergs Markets. - FOR CAL [4947235] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:32 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Conopco. - FOR CAL [4947234] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:30 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by James P. Muehlberger for Appellees Conopco, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Schnuck Markets and Dierbergs Markets w/service 08/20/2020 [4947230] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:28 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/22/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Karen Schulte due 09/22/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4945213] [20-2696] (CMH) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:08 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Order both dated 7/17/2020. [4945208] [20-2696] (CMH) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:04 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4945204] [20-2696] (CMH) [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:58 PM]

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4956734-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. James Patrick Muehlberger. Brief(s) of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Conopco, Dierbergs Markets, Schnuck Markets, Target Corporation and Walmart, Inc. due 11/04/2020. [4956965] [20-2696] (BNW) [Entered: 09/17/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. James Patrick Muehlberger for Appellees Conopco, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Dierbergs Markets and Schnuck Markets correcting [ # 4956734-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Attorney. [4956946] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 09/17/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketOn December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions filed under Rule 27, certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for extension of time to file brief, [ # 4956734-2 ], submitted by Mr. James Patrick Muehlberger in 20-2696, pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion. [20-2696] (BNW) [Entered: 09/17/2020 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/04/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. James Patrick Muehlberger for Appellees Conopco, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Dierbergs Markets and Schnuck Markets w/service 09/17/2020. [4956734] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for Paper Brief, Doc No. [ # 4954387-2 ], filed by Appellant Ms. Karen Schulte [4955095] [20-2696] (DFH) [Entered: 09/13/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for Court Record, Doc No. [ # 4954404-2 ], filed by Appellant Ms. Karen Schulte [4955094] [20-2696] (DFH) [Entered: 09/13/2020 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volume, Comments: 3 copies Record Deficiency due on 09/15/2020. SEE ATTACHED NOTICE. [4954404] [20-2696] (CRJ) [Entered: 09/10/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4952440-2 ] filed by Ms. Karen Schulte 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached Paper brief deficiency due 09/15/2020. SEE ATTACHED NOTICE. [4954387] [20-2696] (CRJ) [Entered: 09/10/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Karen Schulte w/service 09/03/2020. Length: 12,849 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Karen Schulte due 09/08/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief(s) of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Conopco, Dierbergs Markets, Schnuck Markets, Target Corporation and Walmart, Inc. due on 10/05/2020. [4952440] [20-2696] (BNW) [Entered: 09/03/2020 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Ms. Karen Schulte submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4952430] [20-2696] (DFH) [Entered: 09/03/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Walmart, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4947458] [20-2696] (DFM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Christopher R. Wray for Appellees Conopco, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Dierbergs Markets and Schnuck Markets w/service 08/20/2020 [4947242] [20-2696] (CRW) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Schnuck Markets. - FOR CAL [4947239] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4947238] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Dierbergs Markets. - FOR CAL [4947235] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Conopco. - FOR CAL [4947234] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by James P. Muehlberger for Appellees Conopco, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Schnuck Markets and Dierbergs Markets w/service 08/20/2020 [4947230] [20-2696] (JPM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/22/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Karen Schulte due 09/22/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4945213] [20-2696] (CMH) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Order both dated 7/17/2020. [4945208] [20-2696] (CMH) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4945204] [20-2696] (CMH) [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dierbergs Markets, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Schnuck Markets, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CONOPCO, INC. d/b/a UNILEVER HOME & PERSONAL CARE USA is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant