This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 06:06:55 (UTC).

Karen Hepp v. Facebook, et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Karen Hepp filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Facebook. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2885

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

GIPHY INC

WGCZ SRO

FACEBOOK

Defendant / Appellants

REDDIT INC

IMGUR INC

Plaintiff / Appellee

KAREN HEPP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Barry L. Cohen Esq.

Attorney at Royer Cooper Cohen Braunfeld

101 West Elm Street, Suite 400

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Karen A. Chesley Esq.

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner

55 Hudson Yards, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Andrew A. Esbenshade Esq.

Attorney at Durie Tangri

530 Molino Street, Suite 111

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Robert Jackel Esq.

399 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Rachel Kassabian Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Samuel W. Silver Esq.

Attorney at Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis

1600 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Daniel Gross Esq.

Attorney at Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis

1600 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael T. Zeller Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

865 South Figueroa Street, 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Bruce P. Merenstein Esq.

Attorney at Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis

1600 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Dennis L. Wilson Esq.

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton

1801 Century Park East, Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Tywanda H. Lord Esq.

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend

1100 Peachtree Street, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Bonnie M. Hoffman Esq.

Attorney at Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller

One Logan Square, 18Th & Cherry Streets, 27Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Vera Ranieri Esq.

Attorney at Durie Tangri

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joseph C. Gratz Esq.

Attorney at Durie Tangri

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Aditya V. Kamdar Esq.

Attorney at Durie Tangri

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael D. LiPuma Esq.

Attorney at Justin F. Robinette, Esquire

325 Chestnut Street

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Samuel B. Fineman Esq.

Attorney at Cohen Fineman

1999 Marlton Pike East, Suite 4

Cherry Hill, NJ 08003

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dennis L. Wilson on behalf of Appellee(s) Facebook, Inc.. [20-2725, 20-2885] (DLW) [Entered: 11/06/2020 05:19 PM]

#21

(#21) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tywanda Harris Lord on behalf of Appellee(s) Facebook, Inc.. [20-2725, 20-2885] (THL) [Entered: 11/02/2020 04:08 PM]

20 #2

XAP - Briefing Notice Issued

20 #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#19

(#19) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Karen Hepp. [20-2885] (SBF) [Entered: 10/16/2020 01:57 PM]

#18

(#18) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel B. Fineman on behalf of Appellee(s) Karen Hepp. [20-2885] (SBF) [Entered: 10/16/2020 01:55 PM]

#17

(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Vera Ranieri on behalf of Appellant(s) Imgur Inc. and Reddit, Inc.. [20-2885] (VR) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:54 PM]

#16

(#16) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Karen A. Chesley, Esq., Robert Jackel, Esq., Barry L. Cohen, Esq. for Giphy Inc, and Samuel B. Fineman, Esq. for Karen Hepp(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/21/2020. Disclosure Statement on or before 10/21/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:51 AM]

#15

(#15) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Facebook. [20-2885] (BLC) [Entered: 10/06/2020 07:27 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael T. Zeller on behalf of Appellee(s) WGCZ a.s.. [20-2885] (MTZ) [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:34 AM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bruce P. Merenstein on behalf of Appellee(s) WGCZ a.s.. [20-2885] (BPM) [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:30 AM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee WGCZ SRO. [20-2885] (SWS) [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:24 AM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel W. Silver on behalf of Appellee(s) WGCZ a.s.. [20-2885] (SWS) [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:22 AM]

1 #5

MEMORANDUM

1 #4

ORDER

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Case Caption

#1

Case Opening Letter

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dennis L. Wilson on behalf of Appellee(s) Facebook, Inc.. [20-2725, 20-2885] (DLW) [Entered: 11/06/2020 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tywanda Harris Lord on behalf of Appellee(s) Facebook, Inc.. [20-2725, 20-2885] (THL) [Entered: 11/02/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. 1st Brief on behalf of Brief on behalf of Appellant Karen Hepp due on or before 12/07/2020. Appendix due on or before 12/07/2020. [20-2725, 20-2885] (LMR) [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Karen Hepp. [20-2885] (SBF) [Entered: 10/16/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel B. Fineman on behalf of Appellee(s) Karen Hepp. [20-2885] (SBF) [Entered: 10/16/2020 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Vera Ranieri on behalf of Appellant(s) Imgur Inc. and Reddit, Inc.. [20-2885] (VR) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Karen A. Chesley, Esq., Robert Jackel, Esq., Barry L. Cohen, Esq. for Giphy Inc, and Samuel B. Fineman, Esq. for Karen Hepp(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/21/2020. Disclosure Statement on or before 10/21/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Facebook. [20-2885] (BLC) [Entered: 10/06/2020 07:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Barry L. Cohen on behalf of Appellee(s) Facebook, Inc.. [20-2885] (BLC) [Entered: 10/06/2020 07:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aditya V. Kamdar on behalf of Appellant(s) Imgur, Inc. and Reddit, Inc.. [20-2885] (AVK) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Reddit Inc. [20-2885] (JCG) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Imgur Inc. [20-2885] (JCG) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Imgur Inc and Reddit Inc. [20-2885] (JCG) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joseph C. Gratz on behalf of Appellant(s) Imgur, Inc. and Reddit, Inc.. [20-2885] (JCG) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael T. Zeller on behalf of Appellee(s) WGCZ a.s.. [20-2885] (MTZ) [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bruce P. Merenstein on behalf of Appellee(s) WGCZ a.s.. [20-2885] (BPM) [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee WGCZ SRO. [20-2885] (SWS) [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel W. Silver on behalf of Appellee(s) WGCZ a.s.. [20-2885] (SWS) [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Imgur Inc and Reddit Inc in District Court No. 2-19-cv-04034. (LMR) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Imgur, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where REDDIT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMUEL B. FINEMAN, ESQ.(Designation Retained)