Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 06:02:19 (UTC).

Karen Hepp v. Facebook

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Karen Hepp filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Facebook. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2725

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

GIPHY INC

IMGUR INC

WGCZ SRO

REDDIT INC

FACEBOOK

Plaintiff / Appellant

KAREN HEPP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Karen A. Chesley Esq.

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner

55 Hudson Yards, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Robert Jackel Esq.

399 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Joshua M. Stein Esq.

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner

725 South Figueroa Street, 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Andrew A. Esbenshade Esq.

Attorney at Durie Tangri

530 Molino Street, Suite 111

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Vera Ranieri Esq.

Attorney at Durie Tangri

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael D. LiPuma Esq.

Attorney at Justin F. Robinette, Esquire

325 Chestnut Street

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Joseph C. Gratz Esq.

Attorney at Durie Tangri

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael T. Zeller Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

865 South Figueroa Street, 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Rachel Kassabian Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Samuel W. Silver Esq.

Attorney at Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis

1600 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Daniel Gross Esq.

Attorney at Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis

1600 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Aditya V. Kamdar Esq.

Attorney at Durie Tangri

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Bonnie M. Hoffman Esq.

Attorney at Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller

One Logan Square, 18Th & Cherry Streets, 27Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Barry L. Cohen Esq.

Attorney at Royer Cooper Cohen Braunfeld

101 West Elm Street, Suite 400

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Tywanda H. Lord Esq.

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend

1100 Peachtree Street, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Dennis Wilson Esq.

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend

1100 Peachtree Street, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Dennis L. Wilson Esq.

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton

1801 Century Park East, Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Samuel B. Fineman Esq.

Attorney at Cohen Fineman

1999 Marlton Pike East, Suite 4

Cherry Hill, NJ 08003

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Vera Ranieri on behalf of Appellee(s) Imgur Inc. and Reddit, Inc.. [20-2725] (VR) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:53 PM]

#19

(#19) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Karen A. Chesley, Esq. for Giphy Inc, Andrew A. Esbenshade, Esq. for Giphy Inc, Robert Jackel, Esq. for Giphy Inc and Joshua M. Stein, Esq. for Giphy Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 09/24/2020. Disclosure Statement on or before 09/24/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 09/10/2020 02:15 PM]

#17

(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael T. Zeller on behalf of Appellee(s) WGCZ a.s.. [20-2725] (MTZ) [Entered: 09/08/2020 12:08 PM]

#16

(#16) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Facebook. [20-2725] (BLC) [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:09 AM]

#15

(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Barry L. Cohen on behalf of Appellee(s) Facebook, Inc.. [20-2725] (BLC) [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:06 AM]

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aditya V. Kamdar on behalf of Appellee(s) Imgur Inc. and Reddit, Inc.. [20-2725] (AVK) [Entered: 09/04/2020 05:48 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Imgur Inc. [20-2725] (JCG) [Entered: 09/04/2020 05:44 PM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Reddit Inc. [20-2725] (JCG) [Entered: 09/04/2020 05:42 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Karen Hepp. [20-2725] (SBF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:16 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Karen Hepp. [20-2725] (SBF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:14 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel B. Fineman, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Karen Hepp. [20-2725] (SBF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:12 PM]

1 #7

MEMORANDUM 06/05/20

1 #6

MEMORANDUM 08/03/20

1 #5

ORDER 06/05/20

1 #4

ORDER 08/03/20

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Case Caption

#1

Case Opening Letter

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Vera Ranieri on behalf of Appellee(s) Imgur Inc. and Reddit, Inc.. [20-2725] (VR) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#20) Attorney Bar status modified for Samuel B. Fineman, Esq. for Karen Hepp. Status is now active. (TMK) [Entered: 09/11/2020 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Karen A. Chesley, Esq. for Giphy Inc, Andrew A. Esbenshade, Esq. for Giphy Inc, Robert Jackel, Esq. for Giphy Inc and Joshua M. Stein, Esq. for Giphy Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 09/24/2020. Disclosure Statement on or before 09/24/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 09/10/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Samuel B. Fineman, Esq. for Appellant Karen Hepp. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 09/24/2020. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 09/10/2020 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael T. Zeller on behalf of Appellee(s) WGCZ a.s.. [20-2725] (MTZ) [Entered: 09/08/2020 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Facebook. [20-2725] (BLC) [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Barry L. Cohen on behalf of Appellee(s) Facebook, Inc.. [20-2725] (BLC) [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aditya V. Kamdar on behalf of Appellee(s) Imgur Inc. and Reddit, Inc.. [20-2725] (AVK) [Entered: 09/04/2020 05:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Imgur Inc. [20-2725] (JCG) [Entered: 09/04/2020 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Reddit Inc. [20-2725] (JCG) [Entered: 09/04/2020 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Karen Hepp. [20-2725] (SBF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bruce P. Merenstein on behalf of Appellee(s) WGCZ a.s.. [20-2725] (BPM) [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee WGCZ SRO. [20-2725] (SWS) [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel W. Silver on behalf of Appellee(s) WGCZ a.s.. [20-2725] (SWS) [Entered: 09/04/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Karen Hepp advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [20-2725] (SBF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Karen Hepp. [20-2725] (SBF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Karen Hepp. [20-2725] (SBF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel B. Fineman, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Karen Hepp. [20-2725] (SBF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Karen Hepp in District Court No. 2-19-cv-04034. (LMR) [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Imgur, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where REDDIT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMUEL B. FINEMAN, ESQ.(Designation Retained)