This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/28/2021 at 06:09:51 (UTC).

Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC, et al v. Valley Forge Insurance Company, et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Valley Forge Insurance Company,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35520

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

JAE Y. HONG, PLLC

NOSKENDA, INC.

JAE Y. HONG, DDS, PS

PUYALLUP ORAL AND MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY, LLC

OWENS DAVIES, PS

KARA MCCULLOCH, DMD, MSD, PLLC

Defendant / Appellees

NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD

TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY

VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ian S. Birk

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Gretchen Freeman Cappio

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Irene M. Hecht

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Lynn Lincoln Sarko

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Amy Williams-Derry

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Alison Elizabeth Chase

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1129 State Street, Suite 8

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Benjamin Gould

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lianna Bash

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6900

Seattle, WA 98104

H. Christopher Boehning

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Daniel H. Levi

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Brian M. Lipshutz

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1047

Kannon K. Shanmugam

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1047

Anthony Todaro

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6900

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#7

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • Docket(#15) Streamlined request [14] by Appellants Jae Y. Hong, Jae Y. Hong, PLLC, Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC, Noskenda, Inc., Owens Davies, PS and Puyallup Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery, LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Jae Y. Hong, Jae Y. Hong, PLLC, Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC, Noskenda, Inc., Owens Davies, PS and Puyallup Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery, LLC opening brief due 09/22/2021. Appellees National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transportation Insurance Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company answering brief due 10/22/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12207335] (BG) [Entered: 08/20/2021 01:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docket(#14) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Jae Y. Hong, Jae Y. Hong, PLLC, Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC, Noskenda, Inc., Owens Davies, PS and Puyallup Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery, LLC. New requested due date is 09/22/2021. [12207268] [21-35520] (Gould, Benjamin) [Entered: 08/20/2021 12:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [12186990] (LW) [Entered: 07/29/2021 02:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/16/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12167148] (LW) [Entered: 07/08/2021 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#11) Added Attorney(s) Lianna Bash for party(s) Appellee Valley Forge Insurance Company Appellee National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford Appellee Transportation Insurance Company. [12165225] (RL) [Entered: 07/07/2021 01:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lianna, M., Bash (DLA Piper LLP (US), 701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6900, Seattle, WA 98104) for Appellees National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transportation Insurance Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company. Date of service: 07/06/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12164106] [21-35520] (Bash, Lianna) [Entered: 07/06/2021 04:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Brian M. Lipshutz, Kannon K. Shanmugam for party(s) Appellee Valley Forge Insurance Company Appellee National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford Appellee Transportation Insurance Company, in case 21-35520. [12163963] (RR) [Entered: 07/06/2021 03:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/06/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12163447]. [21-35520] (AD) [Entered: 07/06/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jae Y. Hong, Jae Y. Hong, PLLC, Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC, Noskenda, Inc. and Owens Davies, PS Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/06/2021. [12163266] [21-35520] (Birk, Ian) [Entered: 07/06/2021 11:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian M. Lipshutz (Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP; 2001 K Street NW, Washington, D.C. 20006-1047) for Appellees National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transportation Insurance Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company. Date of service: 07/06/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12162654] [21-35520] (Lipshutz, Brian) [Entered: 07/06/2021 07:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kannon K. Shanmugam (Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP; 2001 K Street NW, Washington, D.C. 20006-1047) for Appellees National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transportation Insurance Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company. Date of service: 07/06/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12162648] [21-35520] (Shanmugam, Kannon) [Entered: 07/06/2021 07:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Alison Elizabeth Chase, Benjamin Gould for party(s) Appellant Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC Appellant Puyallup Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery, LLC Appellant Jae Y. Hong Appellant Noskenda, Inc. Appellant Jae Y. Hong, PLLC Appellant Owens Davies, PS, in case 21-35520. [12161555] (RR) [Entered: 07/02/2021 11:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alison E. Chase (Keller Rohrback LLP, 801 Garden Street, Suite 301, Santa Barbara, CA 93101) for Appellants Jae Y. Hong, Jae Y. Hong, PLLC, Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC, Noskenda, Inc., Owens Davies, PS and Puyallup Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery, LLC. Date of service: 07/02/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12161519] [21-35520] (Chase, Alison) [Entered: 07/02/2021 11:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Benjamin B. Gould (Keller Rohrback LLP, 1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200, Seattle, WA 98101) for Appellants Jae Y. Hong, Jae Y. Hong, PLLC, Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC, Noskenda, Inc., Owens Davies, PS and Puyallup Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery, LLC. Date of service: 07/02/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12161362] [21-35520] (Gould, Benjamin) [Entered: 07/02/2021 10:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Jae Y. Hong, Jae Y. Hong, PLLC, Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC, Noskenda, Inc., Owens Davies, PS and Puyallup Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/06/2021. Appellants Jae Y. Hong, Jae Y. Hong, PLLC, Kara McCulloch, DMD, MSD, PLLC, Noskenda, Inc., Owens Davies, PS and Puyallup Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery, LLC opening brief due 08/23/2021. Appellees National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transportation Insurance Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company answering brief due 09/22/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12157208] (JBS) [Entered: 06/29/2021 09:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD is a litigant

Latest cases where Valley Forge Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian M. Lipshutz Esq.