This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/22/2022 at 06:02:59 (UTC).

Kaotica IP Corp. v. Iconic Mars Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 Kaotica IP Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Iconic Mars Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1816

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

KAOTICA IP CORP.

Defendant / Appellees

ICONIC MARS CORPORATION

OLUSEYI JAMES OLALEYE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James Joseph Maune

2050 Main Street

Irvine, CA 92614

Dario Alexander Machleidt Esq.

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1420 Fifth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Kathleen Geyer

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1420 Fifth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Stephen M. Lobbin Esq.

Attorney at SML Avvocati PC

888 Prospect Street

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Stephen M. Lobbin as counsel for Appellees Iconic Mars Corporation and Oluseyi James Olaleye. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853760] [22-1816] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ]. [Stephen Lobbin] [Entered: 06/06/2022 01:34 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Iconic Mars Corporation and Oluseyi James Olaleye. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853761] [22-1816] [Stephen Lobbin] [Entered: 06/06/2022 01:35 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Iconic Mars Corporation and Oluseyi James Olaleye. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853762] [22-1816] [Stephen Lobbin] [Entered: 06/06/2022 01:36 PM]

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Iconic Mars Corporation and Oluseyi James Olaleye, Entry of Appearance [ # 2 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 06/13/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [853790] [ALK] [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:27 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Dario A. Machleidt; Kathleen R. Geyer as counsel for Appellant Kaotica IP Corp.. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853793] [22-1816] [Dario Machleidt] [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:33 PM]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Kaotica IP Corp.. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853795] [22-1816] [Dario Machleidt] [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:35 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Kaotica IP Corp.. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853799] [22-1816] [Dario Machleidt] [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:36 PM]

#9

(#9) Corrected Entry of appearance for Stephen M. Lobbin as counsel for Appellees Iconic Mars Corporation and Oluseyi James Olaleye. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853857] [22-1816] [Stephen Lobbin] [Entered: 06/06/2022 04:00 PM]

#10

(#10) Amended Docketing Statement for the Appellant Kaotica IP Corp.. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853912] [22-1816] [Dario Machleidt] [Entered: 06/06/2022 08:03 PM]

#11

(#11) MOTION of Appellant Kaotica IP Corp. to extend the time to 08/22/2022 to file brief. Service: 07/15/2022 by email. [861272] [22-1816] [Dario Machleidt] [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:11 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 11 ], ERROR: Appellant's motion does not include a Certificate of Compliance. CORRECTION: For future relevant filings, please include a certificate of compliance with the exact word/line count as required by Fed. R. App. P. 32(g). THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [861312] [ALK] [Entered: 07/15/2022 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 11 ] filed by Appellant Kaotica IP Corp. The opening brief is due 08/22/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [861308] [ALK] [Entered: 07/15/2022 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION of Appellant Kaotica IP Corp. to extend the time to 08/22/2022 to file brief. Service: 07/15/2022 by email. [861272] [22-1816] [Dario Machleidt] [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Amended Docketing Statement for the Appellant Kaotica IP Corp.. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853912] [22-1816] [Dario Machleidt] [Entered: 06/06/2022 08:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corrected Entry of appearance for Stephen M. Lobbin as counsel for Appellees Iconic Mars Corporation and Oluseyi James Olaleye. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853857] [22-1816] [Stephen Lobbin] [Entered: 06/06/2022 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Kaotica IP Corp.. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853799] [22-1816] [Dario Machleidt] [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Kaotica IP Corp.. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853795] [22-1816] [Dario Machleidt] [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Dario A. Machleidt; Kathleen R. Geyer as counsel for Appellant Kaotica IP Corp.. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853793] [22-1816] [Dario Machleidt] [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Iconic Mars Corporation and Oluseyi James Olaleye, Entry of Appearance [ # 2 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 06/13/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [853790] [ALK] [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Iconic Mars Corporation and Oluseyi James Olaleye. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853762] [22-1816] [Stephen Lobbin] [Entered: 06/06/2022 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Iconic Mars Corporation and Oluseyi James Olaleye. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853761] [22-1816] [Stephen Lobbin] [Entered: 06/06/2022 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Stephen M. Lobbin as counsel for Appellees Iconic Mars Corporation and Oluseyi James Olaleye. Service: 06/06/2022 by email. [853760] [22-1816] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ]. [Stephen Lobbin] [Entered: 06/06/2022 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/20/2022. [851211] Entry of Appearance is due on 06/06/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/06/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 06/06/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 07/22/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 05/23/2022 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Lobbin